EP2596370 - MAGNETIC IMMUNODIAGNOSTIC METHODS AND KITS FOR THE DETERMINATION OF ANTIBODY/ANTIGEN COMPLEXES IN ERYTHROCYTE BLOOD GROUPING AND PHENOTYPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/22] | MAGNETIC IMMUNODIAGNOSTIC METHODS AND KITS FOR THE DEMONSTRATION OF ANTIBODY/ANTIGEN COMPLEXES IN ERYTHROCYTE BLOOD GROUPING AND PHENOTYPING | ||
[2019/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diagast Eurasanté Parc, 251, avenue Eugène Avinée 59120 Loos / FR | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUCONNIER, Laurence 18 Rue De La Concorde 59491 Villeneuve D'Ascq / FR | 02 /
BARBREAU, Yves 62 Rue Negrier 59420 Mouvaux / FR | 03 /
BOULET, Arnaud 112 Route D'arras 62320 Drocourt / FR | 04 /
ZAKHOUR, Maha 69 Rue Saint Jean-baptiste De La Salle 59000 Lille / FR | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2013/22] | Application number, filing date | 11737928.9 | 21.07.2011 | [2019/52] | WO2011EP62560 | Priority number, date | FR20100055973 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1055973 | US20100409393P | 02.11.2010 Original published format: US 409393 P | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012010666 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596370 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2596370 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/80, G01N33/543, G01N33/68 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/54326 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N33/5434 (US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
G01N33/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE IMMUNDIAGNOSTISCHE VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUM NACHWEIS VON ANTIKÖRPER/ANTIGEN-KOMPLEXEN FÜR ERYTHROZYTENBLUTGRUPPENBESTIMMUNG UND PHÄNOTYPISIERUNG | [2019/37] | English: | MAGNETIC IMMUNODIAGNOSTIC METHODS AND KITS FOR THE DETERMINATION OF ANTIBODY/ANTIGEN COMPLEXES IN ERYTHROCYTE BLOOD GROUPING AND PHENOTYPING | [2019/37] | French: | MÉTHODES D'IMMUNODIAGNOSTIC MAGNÉTIQUE ET NÉCESSAIRES RÉVÉLANT LA PRÉSENCE DE COMPLEXES ANTICORPS/ANTIGÈNES DANS LE CADRE DU GROUPAGE ET DU PHÉNOTYPAGE DU SANG ÉRYTHROCYTAIRE | [2013/22] |
Former [2013/22] | MAGNETISCHE IMMUNDIAGNOSTISCHE VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR DEMONSTRATION VON ANTIKÖRPER/ANTIGEN-KOMPLEXEN FÜR ERYTHROZYTENBLUTGRUPPENBESTIMMUNG UND PHÄNOTYPISIERUNG | ||
Former [2013/22] | MAGNETIC IMMUNODIAGNOSTIC METHODS AND KITS FOR THE DEMONSTRATION OF ANTIBODY/ANTIGEN COMPLEXES IN ERYTHROCYTE BLOOD GROUPING AND PHENOTYPING | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2011 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | IE | 21.07.2020 | LU | 21.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 21.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 21.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9609409 (MILTENYI BIOTECH INC [US]) [X] 51-53 * the whole document * * page 12, line 27 - page 13, line 1 * [Y] 1-50,54,55; | [Y]WO0073794 (STEMCELL TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-50,54,55 * the whole document * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 3 * * example 2 *; | [YD]WO2007051844 (DIAGAST [FR], et al) [YD] 1-50,54,55 * abstract * * page 23, lines 14-16 * * example 2 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2007092028 (MEDICAL DISCOVERY PARTNERS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-50,54,55 * the whole document *; | [Y] - BOUIX OLIVIER ET AL, "Erythrocyte-magnetized technology: an original and innovative method for blood group serology.", TRANSFUSION SEP 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18522706, (200809), vol. 48, no. 9, ISSN 1537-2995, pages 1878 - 1885, XP002657699 [Y] 1-50,54,55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1537-2995.2008.01790.x | Examination | WO8703096 | by applicant | EP0058780 | EP0194212 | EP0230768 | EP0351857 | EP0426170 | WO9217781 | EP0528708 | EP0755719 | WO9802752 | WO0246758 | WO2005121805 | WO2007051844 |