EP2585931 - DEVICE, STRING, AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATA, AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt B.P. 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt B.P. 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau Rocquencourt BP 105 78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN ABDALLAH, Riadh 46 rue Dedieu 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
FRABOULET, Antoine 14 rue Basse Combalot F-69000 Lyon / FR | 03 /
MARTIN, Jérôme 1 Allée des Moscaries 38240 Meylan / FR | 04 /
RISSET, Tanguy 50 rue du Docteur Rollet F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2013/19] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
BEN ABDALLAH, Riadh 50 rue Léon Croc 91400 Orsay / FR | ||
02 /
FRABOULET, Antoine 14 rue Basse Combalot F-69000 Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
MARTIN, Jérôme 1 passage des Lisses F-38240 Meylan / FR | |||
04 /
RISSET, Tanguy 50 rue du Docteur Rollet F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | Representative(s) | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | [2015/17] |
Former [2013/18] | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, Rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11738013.9 | 23.06.2011 | WO2011FR51456 | Priority number, date | FR20100055125 | 25.06.2010 Original published format: FR 1055125 | [2013/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011161386 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2585931 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2585931 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, STRING UND VERFAHREN ZUR DATENVERARBEITUNG SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2013/18] | English: | DEVICE, STRING, AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATA, AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2013/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF, CHAINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR CORRESPONDANT | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 20.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2011 | AL | 22.04.2015 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | RS | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | IE | 23.06.2015 | LU | 23.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2009235019 (COSTIN MARK H [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0034] * * figure 2A *; | [A]US5347634 (HERRELL RUSS W [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | US2009235019 |