EP2619480 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SHIFTING IN A SEMI-AUTOMATIC GEAR TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜRTHNER, Maik Hepbacherstraße 29 88677 Markdorf / DE | 02 /
MAIER, Alexander Newtonweg 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | 03 /
STAUDINGER, Joachim Jenaerweg 12 87700 Memmingen / DE | 04 /
KEMLER, Johannes Markstr. 34 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2013/32] |
Former [2013/31] | 01 /
WÜRTHNER, Maik Hepbacherstraße 29 88677 Markdorf / DE | ||
02 /
MAIER, Alexander Newtonweg 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | |||
03 /
STAUDINGER, Joachim Oberamteigasse 9 88214 Ravensburg / DE | |||
04 /
KEMLER, Johannes Markstr. 34 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11738747.2 | 03.08.2011 | [2016/14] | WO2011EP63383 | Priority number, date | DE20101041324 | 24.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010041324 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012038139 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619480 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2619480 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F16H61/21 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (US);
B60W10/184 (US);
F16H61/21 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W40/072 (US);
B60W40/076 (US);
F16H2059/366 (EP,US);
F16H2059/663 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | F16H61/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHALTSTEUERUNG EINES AUTOMATISIERTEN STUFENSCHALTGETRIEBES | [2013/31] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SHIFTING IN A SEMI-AUTOMATIC GEAR TRANSMISSION | [2013/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DES PASSAGES DE RAPPORT D'UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES AUTOMATISÉE | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 19.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2011 | AL | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | MT | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | AT | 03.08.2016 | GB | 03.08.2016 | IE | 03.08.2016 | LU | 03.08.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
GB | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.08.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4446111 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE10142274 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1750038 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * abstract *; | [AD]DE102005050753 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [AD] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] *; | [XDI]DE102006001818 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * [I] 2-20 | by applicant | DE10142274 | DE102005050753 | DE102006001818 |