EP2591107 - NUCLEIC ACID APTAMER-BASED DIAGNOSTIC METHODS WITH NOVEL TECHNIQUES FOR SIGNAL ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptateck Bio Ltd. 7 Golda Meir St. Weizmann Science Park 74036 Ness Ziona / IL | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUSSBAUM, Ofer Hermann Maas St. 1 76566 Rehovot / IL | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11739164.9 | 06.07.2011 | WO2011IL00530 | Priority number, date | US20100361611P | 06.07.2010 Original published format: US 361611 P | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012004790 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2591107 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/115, C12N15/11, G01N33/543 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/115 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Q1/706 (US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,US);
C12N2320/10 (EP,US);
G01N2333/49 (US);
G01N2333/585 (US);
G01N2469/10 (US);
Y02A50/30 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2525/205, C12Q2565/401 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2525/205, C12Q2565/401 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | AUF NUKLEINSÄUREAPTAMER BASIERENDES DIAGNOSTISCHES VERFAHREN MIT NEUEN VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALVERSTÄRKUNG | [2013/20] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID APTAMER-BASED DIAGNOSTIC METHODS WITH NOVEL TECHNIQUES FOR SIGNAL ENHANCEMENT | [2013/20] | French: | MÉTHODES DIAGNOSTIQUES BASÉES SUR DES APTAMÈRES DE TYPE ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE METTANT EN UVRE DE NOUVELLES TECHNIQUES POUR L'AMÉLIORATION DU SIGNAL | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2017 | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2018 | 31.07.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO0179562 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [ID] 1,6-11,13,18-29,31,36-39,47-49,51-54,57,60,62,63,67-69 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 6, line 15 - line 28 * * page 16, line 2 - line 6 * * figure 1B * * page 30, line 6 - line 30; example 5 *; | [XI]WO2005113817 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,18,19,22-27,31,34,36-39,47,49-54,57,60,62,63,68,69 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 4; figure 8 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 18, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 19, paragraph 2 * * page 23, paragraph 4 * * page 43, paragraph l; example 2 * * page 48, paragraph l - page 49, paragraph 1; example 5 * * claims 33, 37-39 * * claims 34-35 * * claims 59-60,66 * [I] 14-16,20,21,28-30,32,33,35,40-42,45,46,48,58,59,64-67,70-73; | [X]WO2007024676 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6-13,18,19,23,47-50,53,54,60,62,63,68,69 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1-2,6,11-14 *; | [X]WO2009070640 (GREAT BASIN SCIENT [US], et al) [X] 1,6-13,18-25,34-40,45-54,57-60,62-73 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 9 * * page 4, paragraph 12 - paragraph 13 * * page 6, paragraph 22 * * page 7, paragraph 28 * * page 11, paragraph 40 - paragraph 41 * * page 12, paragraph 43 - page 13, paragraph 45 * * page 14, paragraph 49 - paragraph 51 * * page 15, paragraph 53 - page 17, paragraph 60 * * page 28, paragraph 100 * * page 30, paragraph 106 * * claims 1, 4-5 * * claims 12-15 * * claims 16-17 *; | [A] - DELAIR T ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF NUCLEIC ACID-(CO)POLYMER CONJUGATES: APPLICATION TO DIAGNOSTICS", POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, WILEY & SONS, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, (19980601), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1099-1581(199806)9:6<349::AID-PAT789>3.3.CO;2-A, ISSN 1042-7147, pages 349 - 361, XP000765706 [A] 1 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 358, column r, paragraph l - page 359, column r, paragraph 2; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1581(199806)9:6<349::AID-PAT789>3.3.CO;2-A | [A] - JULIEN BERNARD ET AL, "Water-Soluble Dendrigrafts Bearing Saccharidic Moieties: Elaboration and Application to Enzyme Linked OligoSorbent Assay (ELOSA) Diagnostic Tests", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20060101), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1021/bc049708j, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 6 - 14, XP055010909 [A] 1 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc049708j | by applicant | WO0179562 | US6458543 | WO2007117444 | US2009203028 | - LR PABORSKY ET AL., "The Single-Stranded DNA Aptamer-Binding Site of Human Thrombin", J. OF BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 808 - 811 | - M SASSANFAR, JW SZOSTAK, "An RNA Motif That Binds ATP", NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, pages 550 - 553 | - MIR M, KATAKIS I, "Aptamers as elements of bioelectronic devices", MOL. BIOSYST., (2007), vol. 3, pages 620 - 622 | - LEVY, M, CATER, SF, ELLINGTON, AD, "Quantum-dot aptamer beacons for the detection of proteins", CHEMBIOCHEM, (2005), vol. 6, pages 2163 - 2166 | - "Aptamers", WILLIAM JAMES, Encyclopedia of Analytical Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, (2000), pages 4848 - 4871 | - PAI SS, ELLINGTON AD, "Using RNA aptamers and the proximity ligation assay for the detection of cell surface antigens", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 504, pages 385 - 398 | - ZEESHAN M ET AL., "comparison of different phenotypic methods of detection of methicillin resistance in staphylococcus aureus with the molecular detection of mec-agene", J. COLL. PHYSICIANS., (2007), vol. 17, pages 666 - 70 | - "Aptamers", WILLIAM JAMES, Encyclopedia of Analytical Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, (2000), pages 4848 - 48716 | - TOMBELLI S ET AL., "Aptamers-based assays for diagnostics, environmental and food analysis", BIOMOL ENG., (2007), vol. 24, pages 191 - 200 | - MICHAEL J. ET AL., "The rational development of molecularly imprinted polymer-based sensors for protein detection", CHEM. SOC. REV., (2011), vol. 40, pages 1547 - 1571 | - RAYMOND U. ET AL., "CMV Antigenemia Following Bone Marrow Transplantation: Risk Factors and Outcomes", THE 2000 AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, (2000), vol. 17, pages 280 - 288 | - PARAGAS VB, ZHANG YZ, HAUGLAND RP, SINGER VL, "The ELF-97 alkaline phosphatase substrate provides a bright, photostable, fluorescent signal amplification method for FISH", J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1997), vol. 45, pages 345 - 57 | - KERSTENS HM, PODDIGHE PJ, HANSELAAR AG, "A novel in situ hybridization signal amplification method based on the deposition of biotinylated tyramine", J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1995), vol. 43, pages 347 - 52 | - PETER BIRNER, BARBARA BACHTIARY ET AL., "Signal-Amplified Colorimetric In Situ Hybridization for Assessment of Human Papillomavirus Infection in Cervical Lesions", MOD. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 14, pages 702 - 709 | - EDMONDS M., BRANCHED RNA, BIOESSAYS, vol. 6, pages 212 - 21 | - CHIEN-HUNG CHEN ET AL., "Quantitative detection of hepatitis B virus DNA in human sera by branched-DNA signal amplification", J. OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, (1995), vol. 53, pages 131 - 137 | - TAO CHEN ET AL., "Valuation of Quantitative PCR and Branched-Chain DNA Assay for Detection of Hepatitis B Virus DNA in Sera from Hepatocellular Carcinoma and Liver Transplant Patients", J. OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 38, pages 1977 - 1980 | - GILADI H, KETZINEL-GILAD M, RIVKIN L, FELIG Y, NUSSBAUM 0, GALUN E, "Small Interfering RNA Inhibits HBV Replication in Mice", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2003), vol. 8, pages 769 - 76 | - YUAN LI ET AL., "Ultrasensitive Densitometry Detection of Cytokines with Nanoparticle-Modified Aptamers", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 53, page 6 | - YONG HUANG ET AL., "Electrochemical immunosensor of platelet- derived growth factor with aptamer-primed polymerase amplification", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 382, page 22 | - BARRETT D ET AL., "Kinetic Characterization of the Glycosyltransferase Module of Staphylococcus aureus PBP2", J. BACTRIO., (200503), pages 2215 - 2217 | - ZEESHAN M ET AL., "comparison of different phenotypic methods of detection of methicillin resistance in staphylococcus aureus with the molecular detection of mec-a gene", J. COLL. PHYSICIANS. SURG. PAK., (2007), vol. 17, pages 666 - 70 | - DABELSTEEN E, "Cell surface carbohydrates as prognostic markers in human carcinomas", THE JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, vol. 179, pages 358 - 369 | - FARRA A ET AL., "Role of outer membrane protein OprD and penicillin-binding proteins in resistance of Pseudomonas aeruginosa to imipenem and meropenem", INT. J. ANTIMICROB. AGENTS, (2008), vol. 31, pages 427 - 33 | - MARUNA ET AL., PHYSIOLOGY AND GENETICS OF PROCALCITONIN PHYSIOL. RES., (2000), vol. 49, pages 57 - 61 | - DONDANA, "Procalcitonin increase after endotoxin injection in normal subjects", J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (1994), vol. 79, pages 1605 - 1608 | - OLEMPSKA M ET AL., "Detection of tumor stem cell markers in pancreatic carcinoma cell lines", HEPATOBILIARY PANCREAT DIS INT., (2007), vol. 6 | - BALSLEV U ET AL., "An outbreak of borderline oxacillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus (BORSA) in a dermatological unit", MICROB. DRUG RESIST., (2005), vol. 11, pages 78 - 81 |