EP2593074 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A NEAR TERMINAL-BRANCHED COMPOUND AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIBEL, Jeffrey, John 795 Kingfisher Lane Glendale, OH 45246 / US | 02 /
KITKO, David, Johnathan 8012 Hickory Hill Lane Cincinnati OH 45211 / US | 03 /
XU, Jun 7867 Winding Creek Ct. Mason OH 45040 / US | 04 /
SAUNDERS, Charles, Winston 1874 Park Place Fairfield OH 45014 / US | 05 /
PRICE, Kenneth, Nathan 11810 East Miami River Road Cincinnati OH 45252 / US | 06 /
URBIN, Stephanie, Ann 7015 Valley Falls Court Liberty Township OH 45011 / US | 07 /
GREEN, Phillip, Richard 540 Compton Road Wyoming OH 45231 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Pierce, Christopher James Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/45] | Holmes, Rosalind Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2013/21] | Marollé, Patrick Pierre Pascal Wella Services GmbH Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11739222.5 | 14.07.2011 | WO2011US43993 | Priority number, date | US20100364519P | 15.07.2010 Original published format: US 364519 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012009525 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593074 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINER VERZWEIGTEN VERBINDUNG IN ENDNÄHE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/21] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A NEAR TERMINAL-BRANCHED COMPOUND AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2013/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN COMPOSÉ À RAMIFICATION PROCHE DE L'EXTRÉMITÉ ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LES PRÉPARER | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0172269 (CRODA INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * table II *; | [X]WO02100373 (KNUT HAADEM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * example 5 *; | [X]US4985466 (DEGUCHI HISASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10 * column 2, line 5 - line 17 *; | [I]WO9920722 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * examples 4,5,52,70,71,72,73; claim 1 *; | [I]JP2008297218 (KAO CORP) [I] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010070088 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6020303 | US6060443 | US6335312 | US2010137649 | WO9920722 | US2010105955 | US2010105963 | WO2007136752 | WO2008119082 | WO2009111672 | US7169588 | US4545941 | US2010160506 | WO2008046106 | US2008255328 | US7635794 | WO0146096 | US2003135080 | US5942653 | US4943397 | WO0014038 | US6777582 | US4483781 | EP0133354 | US4412934 | US4634551 | US4915854 | US4966723 | US5580485 | US4430243 | US4728455 | US5246621 | US5244594 | US5284944 | US5194416 | US5246612 | US5256779 | US5280117 | US5274147 | US5153161 | US5227084 | US5114606 | US5114611 | EP0549271 | EP0544490 | EP0549272 | EP0544440 | US5576282 | US5597936 | US5595967 | WO2005042532 | US4033718 | WO9307263 | WO9307260 | WO8908694 | US3553139 | US4101457 | US4507219 | US4261868 | US3600319 | US3519570 | EP0199405 | EP0200586 | WO9401532 | US5427711 | WO9206154 | US3664961 | US4956447 | US4968451 | US4711730 | US4721580 | US4702857 | US4877896 | US3959230 | US3893929 | US4000093 | US5415807 | US4201824 | US4240918 | US4525524 | US4579681 | US4787989 | EP0219048 | EP0279134 | EP0457205 | DE233504 | US4597898 | US548744 | US4891160 | EP0111965 | EP0111984 | EP0112592 | WO9532272 | US3308067 | EP0066915 | EP0193360 | US4790856 | US3646015 | US4489455 | US4489574 | US2954347 | US4265779 | US3455839 | US3933672 | US4652392 | US4978471 | US4983316 | US5288431 | US4639489 | US4749740 | US4798679 | US4075118 | EP0150872 | EP2124526 | US6855680 | WO2010034736 | WO9108281 | WO9001815 | US4062647 | US4375416 | US4291071 | US3929678 | US2658072 | US2438091 | US2528378 | US2486921 | US2486922 | US2396278 | US3332880 | US4275055 | US3962418 | US3958581 | US2007207109 | US34584 | US5104646 | US5106609 | US4152416 | US2826551 | US3964500 | US4364837 | US6607717 | US6482969 | US5807956 | US5981681 | US6207782 | US7465439 | US7041767 | US7217777 | US2007286837 | US2005048549 | US2007041929 | GB849433 | DE10036533 | US5674478 | US5750122 | US4529586 | US4507280 | US4663158 | US4197865 | US4217914 | US4381919 | US4422853 | US2809971 | US3236733 | US3753196 | US3761418 | US4345080 | US4323683 | US4379753 | US4470982 | US4741855 | US5607980 | US5681852 | US5652228 | US5487884 | WO9116035 | WO9116034 | US6235773 | US2006275237 | US2004175347 | US2009221463 | - SCHEIBEL, "The Evolution of Anionic Surfactant Technology to Meet the Requirements of the Laundry Detergent Industry", JOURNAL OF SURFACTANTS AND DETERGENTS, (200410), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1007/s11743-004-0317-7, XP055033609 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11743-004-0317-7 | - SCHLOSSMAN ET AL., "Lanolin and Its Derivatives", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL-CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (1978), vol. 55, pages 447 - 450 | - CONTACT DERMATITIS, (1979), vol. 5, pages 65 - 72 | - SUGURO ET AL., AGRIC, BIOL. CHEM., (1979), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 869 - 860 | - FLAVOUR FRAGR. J., (2004), vol. 19, pages 199 - 204 | - STUIVER ET AL., RADIOCARBON, (1977), vol. 19, page 355 | - "Source Apportionment of Atmospheric Particles", CURRIE, Characterization of Environmental Particles, LEWIS PUBLISHERS, INC., (1992), vol. I, pages 3 - 74 | - MARVY ET AL., "Ruthenium Carbene Mediated Meathesis of Oleate-Type Fatty Compounds", INT. J. MOL. SCI., (2008), vol. 9, pages 615 - 625 | - BUCHMEISER, "Polymer-Supported Well-Defined Metathesis Catalysts", CHEM. REV., (2009), vol. 109, pages 303 - 321 | - Kirk Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Third Edition, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1979), vol. 7, pages 430 - 447 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, 2d ed.,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1989), vol. 15, pages 204 - 308 | - "Antiacne Agents", Personal Care Product Council's International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook | US20090289039 | US19850740446 | EP19890307851 | EP19940921505 |