EP2598053 - TRANSWALL VISUALIZATION ARRANGEMENTS FOR SURGICAL CIRCULAR STAPLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV Frederick E. 245 E. Main Street Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US | 02 /
WILLIS, John W. 5098 Palermo Road Cincinnati, OH 45244 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2013/23] | 01 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick, E. 245 E. Main Street Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US | ||
02 /
WILLIS, John, W. 5098 Palermo Road Cincinnati, OH 45244 / US | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/43] |
Former [2013/23] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11739253.0 | 27.07.2011 | [2015/43] | WO2011US45517 | Priority number, date | US20100846956 | 30.07.2010 Original published format: US 846956 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012015907 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2598053 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2598053 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11, A61B17/115, A61B1/00 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B17/3431 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B17/3421 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00128 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00349 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0225 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1132 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22034 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2943 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0427 (EP,US);
A61B2090/061 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0801 (EP,US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0807 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0816 (EP,US);
A61B2090/309 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3912 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH EINE WAND GEHENDE VISUALISIERUNGSANORDNUNGEN FÜR CHIRURGISCHE KREISFÖRMIGE STAPLER | [2013/23] | English: | TRANSWALL VISUALIZATION ARRANGEMENTS FOR SURGICAL CIRCULAR STAPLERS | [2013/23] | French: | AGENCEMENTS DE VISUALISATION À TRAVERS LA PAROI POUR AGRAFEUSES CHIRURGICALES CIRCULAIRES | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 24.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2011 | AL | 21.10.2015 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2007135803 (BELSON AMIR [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11-14,16,17 * paragraphs [0397] , [0399] , [0404]; figures 61-64 * [A] 3,6,10; | [YA]US2005014994 (FOWLER DENNIS L [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,7-9,11,13-17 * paragraph [0033]; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4,6,10,12; | [Y]EP2030578 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [Y] 4,12,15 * paragraphs [0028] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US2005075657 (BOMBARD DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0122] * | by applicant | US5104025 | US5205459 | US5285945 | US5309927 | US6117148 | US7094247 | US5669918 | US2008078806 |