EP2533430 - PORTABLE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL FOR EXTRACTING SUBJECTS OF INTEREST TO THE USER, AND A METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea University Research and Business Foundation Korea University Anamdong 5-ga-1 Seongbuk-gu, Seoul 136-075 / KR | [2020/11] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Korea University Research And Business Foundation Korea University Anamdong 5-ga-1 Seongbuk-gu, Seoul 136-075 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Keun 205-1104 Dogok Rexie Apt. Dokok-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-506 / KR | 02 /
HA, Jong Woo 608A, Science Library, Korea University Anam-dong, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-713 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jung Hyun 102-1905 Hyundai 1-cha Apt. Daerim 3-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-765 / KR | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/50] | 01 /
LEE, Sang Keun 205-1104 Dogok Rexie Apt. Dokok-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-506 / KR | ||
02 /
HA, Jong Woo 404 149-1 Anam-dong 1-ga Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-071 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Jung Hyun 102-1905 Hyundai 1-cha Apt. Daerim 3-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-765 / KR | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2020/11] |
Former [2012/50] | Hössle, Markus Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11739986.5 | 31.01.2011 | [2020/11] | WO2011KR00663 | Priority number, date | KR20100010078 | 03.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100010078 | [2012/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011096690 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2533430 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2533430 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06Q30/02, H04B1/40, G06F16/28, G06F16/35, G06F16/951 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (US);
G06F16/284 (EP,US);
G06F16/353 (EP,US);
G06F18/24137 (EP,US);
G06F18/24323 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | H04B1/40, G06K9/62, G06Q30/02 | ||
Former IPC [2012/50] | H04B1/40, G06F17/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT ZUR EXTRAKTION VON FÜR EINEN BENUTZER INTERESSANTEN PERSONEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/50] | English: | PORTABLE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL FOR EXTRACTING SUBJECTS OF INTEREST TO THE USER, AND A METHOD THEREFOR | [2012/50] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION PORTABLE POUR EXTRAIRE DES SUJETS PRÉSENTANT UN INTÉRÊT POUR L'UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2012 | Translation filed | 31.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 04.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2011 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | ES | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MK | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 11.03.2020 | |
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 11.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003074409 (BENTLEY RICHARD M [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] ** paragraph [0045] *; | [XI]US2005216516 (CALISTRI-YEH RANDALL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * Sentences 1-5; paragraph [0030] * * Sentence 2; paragraph [0032] * * Sentences 1-2; paragraph [0037] * * Last sentence; paragraph [0038] * * Sentence 1; paragraph [0040] * * Sentences 1-2; paragraph [0050] * * Sentence 2; paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0066]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0075]; figure 1 * * Sentences 2-4; paragraph [0079] * * Sentence 3; paragraph [0081] * [I] 3,8; | [XY] - Joana Trajkova ET AL, "Improving Ontology-Based User Profiles", Proceedings of RIAO 2004, (20040428), pages 380 - 389, URL: http://http://eolo.cps.unizar.es/docencia/MasterUPV/Articulos/Improving%20Ontology-Based%20User%20Profiles.pdf, (20151008), XP055219472 [X] 1-10 * Whole section 3; page 381 - page 383 * [Y] 1-10 | [X] - AHU SIEG ET AL, "Web search personalization with ontological user profiles", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTEENTH ACM CONFERENCE ON CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT , CIKM '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070101), doi:10.1145/1321440.1321515, ISBN 978-1-59-593803-9, page 525, XP055048869 [X] 1 * Section 3.2 * * Section 3.4 paragraphs 3-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1321440.1321515 | [X] - SUSAN GAUCH ET AL, User Profiles for Personalized Information Access, THE ADAPTIVE WEB; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 54 - 89, (20070424), ISBN 978-3-540-72078-2, XP019057873 [X] 1 * Paragraph 2; page 70 * * Paragraph 3; page 81 * * Paragraph 2, sentence 2; page 82 * | International search | [A]KR20080020011 (IUCF HYU [KR]); | [Y]KR20090108530 (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE); | [Y] - YOONJUNG CHOI ET AL., "Topic and Topic Change Detection in Instance Messaging", JOURNAL OF THE KOREA SOCIETY OF COMPUTER AND INFORMATION, (200812), vol. 13, no. 17, pages 59 - 66, XP008161018 |