EP2531298 - A BUOYANT MULTIFUNCTIONAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL FOR EFFECTIVE REMOVAL OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN WATER AND WASTEWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University of Singapore 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAI, Renbi c/o National University of Singapore Faculty of Engineering Division of Environmental Science&Engineering 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 02 /
HAN, Hui c/o National University of Singapore Faculty of Engineering Division of Environmental Science&Engineering 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/50] | Hull, John Philip Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11740123.2 | 28.01.2011 | [2018/34] | WO2011SG00044 | Priority number, date | US20100300514P | 02.02.2010 Original published format: US 300514 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011096893 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531298 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531298 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/00, B01J37/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B01J31/06 (EP,US);
B01J35/00 (KR);
B01J20/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (KR);
B01J20/321 (EP,US);
B01J20/3238 (EP,US);
B01J20/324 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,US);
B01J21/185 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J37/00 (KR);
B01J37/0221 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/725 (EP,US);
B01J2220/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/28 (EP,US);
C02F1/30 (EP,US);
C02F2101/308 (EP,US);
C02F2101/345 (EP,US);
C02F2303/16 (EP,US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31739 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLES SCHWIMMENDES VERBUNDMATERIAL ZUR EFFEKTIVEN ENTFERNUNG ORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN AUS WASSER UND ABWASSER | [2012/50] | English: | A BUOYANT MULTIFUNCTIONAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL FOR EFFECTIVE REMOVAL OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN WATER AND WASTEWATER | [2012/50] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE MULTIFONCTIONNEL FLOTTANT PERMETTANT D'ÉLIMINER EFFICACEMENT LES COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES CONTENUS DANS L'EAU ET LES EAUX USÉES | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | IE | 28.01.2019 | LU | 28.01.2019 | MT | 28.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
MT | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
MT | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
MT | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005191505 (AKARSU MURAT [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * see paragraphs 0071, 0079, 0093, 0112, 0127-0129; 0141-01433; examples 1-10; claims 1-56 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2007149397 (TSENG YAO-HSUAN [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * see examples 1-3; comparative example 1; claims 1-17. * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP1681370 (LEIBNIZ INST NEUE MATERIALIEN [DE]) [X] 1-15 * see paragraphs 0009,0068-0075; examples 1-9; claims 11-23. * [Y] 1-15; | [XY] - HIROSHI TAODA, "DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF PHOTOCATALYTIC TECHNOLOGY", SYNTHESIOLOGY-ENGLISH EDITION, (20091231), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 263 - 272, XP002708432 [X] 1-15 * see point 4.1.3 "Development of photocatalytic that can be used in textiles and plastics" and figure 2 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5571/syntheng.1.263 | [XY] - Azzaryiatul Hafizah Amar, "Development of a simple dip coating method for immobilization of TiO2 onto solid supports using direct TiO2 powder (Thesis)", (20090121), pages i - 24, URL: http://eprints.usm.my/7847/1/DEVELOPMENT_OF_A_SIMPLE_DIP_COATING_METHOD_FOR_IMMOBILIZATION_OF_TiO2_ONTO_SOLID_SUPPORTS_USING_DIRECT_TiO2_POWDER.pdf, (20130801), XP002708433 [X] 1-15 * see pages xx-xxi, 15. * [Y] 1-15 | [Y] - EVA S. LONCAR ET AL., "DETERMINATION OF THE PHOTOCATALYTIC ACTIVITY OF TiO2 COATINGS ON CLAY ROOFING TILE SUBSTRATES-METHYLENE BLUE AS MODEL POLLUTANT", Academic Journals database, (20091231), pages 125 - 133, URL: http://www.journaldatabase.org/articles/determination_photocatalytic_activity.html, (20130801), XP002708456 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2298/APT0940125L | [Y] - SZE M. LAM ET AL., "RECENT PATENTS ON PHOTOCATALYSIS OVER NANOSIZED TITANIUM DIOXIDE", (20081231), pages 209 - 219, Recent Patents on Chemical Engineering, URL: http://www.benthamscience.com/cheng/samples/cheng1-3.tar/0004CHENG.pdf, (20130801), XP002708457 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/2211334710801030209 | [Y] - GUAN-TING PAN ET AL., "Immobilization of TiO2 onto nonwoven fiber textile by silica sol: photocatalytic activity and duradibility studies", vol. 16, no. 6, (20061231), pages 413 - 420, JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL ENGINEERING AND MANAGEMENT, URL: http://ser.cienve.org.tw/download/16-6/jeeam16-6_413-420.pdf, (20130801), XP002708458 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5981426 (LANGFORD COOPER H [CA], et al); | [A]US6531100 (OGATA SHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2005011827 (KOSLOW EVAN E [US]); | [X]US2007149397 (TSENG YAO-HSUAN [TW], et al) | Examination | - FABIYI M E ET AL, "PHOTOCATALYTIC MINERALISATION OF METHYLENE BLUE USING BUOYANT TIO2-COATED POLYSTYRENE BEADS", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, A: CHEMIS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (20000101), vol. 132, no. 1/02, doi:10.1016/S1010-6030(99)00250-6, ISSN 1010-6030, pages 121 - 128, XP009058941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1010-6030(99)00250-6 | - SHIFU C ET AL, "Photocatalytic degradation of organophosphorus pesticides using floating photocatalyst TiO"2.SiO"2/beads by sunlight", SOLAR ENE, PERGAMON PRESS. OXFORD, GB, (20050701), vol. 79, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.SOLENER.2004.10.006, ISSN 0038-092X, pages 1 - 9, XP004942366 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solener.2004.10.006 | - F. Magalhães ET AL, "Floating photocatalysts based on TiO2 grafted on expanded polystyrene beads for the solar degradation of dyes", SOLAR ENERGY., GB, (20090901), vol. 83, no. 9, doi:10.1016/j.solener.2009.04.005, ISSN 0038-092X, pages 1521 - 1526, XP055418274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solener.2009.04.005 | by applicant | - Y. LI et al., Water Res., (20060000), vol. 40, pages 1119 - 1125 | - X. WANG et al., J. Hazard. Mater., (20090000), vol. 169, pages 1061 - 1067 | - M.E. BABYYI et al., "PHOTOCATALYTIC MINERALISATION OF METHYLENE BLUE SING BUOYANT Ti0 -COATED POLYSTYRENE BEAD", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY; A. CHEMISTRY, (20000000), vol. 132, pages 121 - 128 |