EP2531941 - CONTEXTUAL QUERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIKANTH, Munirathnam c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
VADDADI, Phani c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
NAJM, Tarek c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11740165.3 | 13.01.2011 | WO2011US21210 | Priority number, date | US20100700985 | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 700985 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011097057 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2531941 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G06F16/3332 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/36 (EP,US);
G06F16/367 (KR);
G06F16/80 (KR);
G06F16/951 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | KONTEXTUELLE ANFRAGEN | [2012/50] | English: | CONTEXTUAL QUERIES | [2012/50] | French: | INTERROGATIONS CONTEXTUELLES | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 12.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 13.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2019 | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/40] | 26.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007192300 (REUTHER PHYLLIS [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0069] , [0 79] , [0 81] , [0 83] * [A] 3,10; | [A]US2009164441 (CHEYER ADAM [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SHUN HATTORI ET AL, "Context-Aware Query Refinement for Mobile Web Search", APPLICATIONS AND THE INTERNET WORKSHOPS, 2007. SAINT WORKSHOPS 2007. I NTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20070101), ISBN 978-0-7695-2757-4, pages 15 - 15, XP031044107 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2.1 - page 2, paragraph 3.1 * | International search | [A]WO2008027503 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [A]US2003177112 (GARDNER STEVE [GB]); | [A]US7152031 (JENSEN DELOS C [US], et al); | [A]US6675159 (LIN ALBERT DEIRCHOW [US], et al) | Examination | US2006047632 | US7603349 | by applicant | US2007192300 | - SHUN HATTORI ET AL., CONTEXT-AWARE QUERY REFINEMENT FOR MOBILE WEB SEARCH |