EP2531597 - ENGINEERED ENZYMES WITH METHIONINE-GAMMA-LYASE ENZYMES AND PHARMACOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS THEROF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEMase, Inc. 815-A Brazos Street, No. 101 Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2021/01] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states AEMase, Inc. 815-A Brazos Street, No. 101 Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states GMA Technologies LLC 6405 Williams Ridge Way Austin, TX 78731 / US | ||
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Georgiou, George 6405 Williams Ridge Way Austin, TX 78731 / US | ||
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGIOU, George 6405 Williams Riddge Way Austin, TX 78731 / US | 02 /
STONE, Everett 7004 Deborah Dr. Austin, TX 78752-3132 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2021/01] |
Former [2012/50] | Rutt, Jason Edward Rouse Patents Patents Agency 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11740355.0 | 03.02.2011 | [2021/01] | WO2011US23606 | Priority number, date | US20100301368P | 04.02.2010 Original published format: US 301368 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011097381 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2531597 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531597 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/88, C12N15/60, A61K38/51, A61P35/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
C12N9/88 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/527 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/51 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/52 (KR);
C12N15/70 (KR);
C12N9/96 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/02 (KR);
C12Q1/10 (US);
C12Y404/01001 (KR);
C12Y404/01011 (KR);
G01N2333/988 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANIPULIERTE ENZYME MIT METHIONIN-GAMMA-LYASE-ENZYMEN UND PHARMAKOLOGISCHE PRÄPARATE DARAUS | [2012/50] | English: | ENGINEERED ENZYMES WITH METHIONINE-GAMMA-LYASE ENZYMES AND PHARMACOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS THEROF | [2012/50] | French: | ENZYMES GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉES PAR DES ENZYMES MÉTHIONINE-GAMMA-LYASE, ET PRÉPARATIONS PHARMACOLOGIQUES ASSOCIÉES | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 19.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2020 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2011 | AL | 06.01.2021 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | NL | 06.01.2021 | PL | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | TR | 06.01.2021 | IE | 03.02.2021 | LU | 03.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 03.02.2011 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
TR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.02.2011 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HU | 03.02.2011 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 03.02.2011 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 03.02.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NL | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0220807 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-30 *; | [Y]WO03106971 (UNIV COLORADO [US]) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-61 *; | [A]US2005036984 (HARRISON ROGER G [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X] - A Bahr, "Q5RFI1", UNIPROT, (20041221), URL: https://www.uniprot.org/uniprot/Q5RFI1.txt, (20181012), XP055514780 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - WEIDONG ZHU ET AL, "Kinetic Properties of Polymorphic Variants and Pathogenic Mutants in Human Cystathionine [gamma]-Lyase +", BIOCHEMISTRY, US, (20080601), vol. 47, no. 23, doi:10.1021/bi800351a, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 6226 - 6232, XP055515416 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi800351a | [A] - KRAUS J P ET AL, "Cystathionine @c-lyase: Clinical, metabolic, genetic, and structural studies", MOLECULAR GENETICS AND METABOLISM, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 97, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.YMGME.2009.04.001, ISSN 1096-7192, (20090801), pages 250 - 259, (20090409), XP026282971 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2009.04.001 | [A] - LU Y ET AL, "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of human liver cDNA encoding for cystathionine @c-lyase", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 189, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0006-291X(92)92265-Y, ISSN 0006-291X, (19921215), pages 749 - 758, (19921215), XP024838385 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(92)92265-Y | [A] - U. BREITINGER ET AL, "The Three-Dimensional Structure of Cystathionine beta-Lyase from Arabidopsis and Its Substrate Specificity", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (20010601), vol. 126, no. 2, doi:10.1104/pp.126.2.631, pages 631 - 642, XP055515421 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.126.2.631 | [T] - EVERETT STONE ET AL, "De novo Engineering of a Human Cystathionine-y-Lyase for Systemic L-Methionine Depletion Cancer Therapy'", ACS CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20121116), vol. 7, no. 11, doi:10.1021/cb300335j, ISSN 1554-8929, pages 1822 - 1829, XP055319839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cb300335j | International search | [A]US2005036984 (HARRISON ROGER G [US], et al) [A] 4-7, 9-32* See the abstract. *; | [A] - ZHU, W. et al., "Kinetic properties of polymorphic variants and pathogenic mutants in human cystathionine gamma-lyase", Biochemistry, (20080514), vol. 47, no. 23, pages 6226 - 6232, XP055515416 [A] 4-7, 9-32 * See the abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi800351a | [A] - KRAUS, J. P et al., "Cystathionine gamma-lyase: Clinical, metabolic, genetic, and structural studies", Molecular Genetics and Metabolism, (20090409), vol. 97, no. 4, pages 250 - 259, XP026282971 [A] 4-7, 9-32 * See the abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2009.04.001 | [A] - LU , Y. et al., "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of human liver cDNA encoding for cystathionine gamma-lyase", Biochemical and Biophysical Research communications, (19921215), vol. 189, no. 2, pages 749 - 758, XP024838385 [A] 4-7, 9-32 * See the abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(92)92265-Y | [A] - BREITINGER, U. et al., "The three-dimensional structure of cystathionine beta -lyase from Arabidopsis and its substrate specificity", Plant Physiology, (20010600), vol. 126, no. 2, pages 631 - 642, XP055515421 [A] 4-7, 9-32 * See the abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.126.2.631 | by applicant | US5889155 | US2009304666 | - RAO et al., J Nutrition, (19900000), vol. 120, pages 1628 - 1632 | - ASHE et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19740000), vol. 57, page 417 | - DATSENKOWANNER, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. US4, (20000000), vol. 97, no. 12, pages 6640 - 5 | - ESAKISODA, Methods Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 143, page 459 | - GILLVON RIPPEL, Anal. Biochem., (19890000), vol. 182, pages 319 - 326 | - GOYER et al., Plant and cell Physiology, (20070000), vol. 48, no. 2, page 232 | - GRIMMINGERFELDNER, J Bacteriology., (19740000), vol. 118, no. 2, page 753 | - HALPERN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19740000), vol. 71, pages 1133 - 1136 | - HARKKI et al., Bio Technology, (19890000), vol. 7, pages 596 - 603 | - HOOVER et al., J Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 37647 - 37654 | - HORI et al., Cancer Res., (19960000), vol. 56, pages 2116 - 2122 | - HUCHEUNG, Intl. J Cancer, (20090000), vol. 124, no. 7 | - ITO et al., J Biochem., (19760000), vol. 79, page 1263 | - KREISGOODENOW, Cancer Res., (19780000), vol. 38, pages 2259 - 2262 | - KREIS et al., Cancer Res., (19800000), vol. 40, pages 634 - 641 | - KREIS, Cancer Treatment Rpts., (19790000), vol. 63, page 1069 | - KUDOU et al., J Biochem., (20070000), vol. 141, page 535 | - LISHKO et al., Anticancer Res., (19930000), vol. 13, pages 1465 - 1468 | - LOPESLAWTHER, Gene(Amsterdam), (19890000), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 255 - 269 | - LORDANESCU, J Bacterial, (19750000), vol. 12, page 597 601 | - LU et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19920000), vol. 189, pages 749 - 758 | - MELLOR et al., Gene, (19830000), vol. 24, pages 1 - 14 | - NAKAMURA et al., Anal. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 138, pages 421 - 424 | - PENTTILA et al., Gene, (19870000), vol. 61, pages 155 - 164 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Printing Company, (19900000), pages 1289 - 1329 | - ROOPENIANAKILESH, Nat. Rev. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 7, pages 715 - 725 | - SIBAKOV et al., Eur. J Biochem., (19840000), vol. 145, page 567 572 | - SRIDHAR et al., Acta Cry stal!. Section D: Biolog, Crystal!., (20000000), vol. 56, pages 1665 - 1667 | - STEEGBOM et al., J Biolog. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, page 12675 | - SUN et al., Anticancer Res., (20050000), vol. 25, no. 1A, pages 59 - 62 | - TAKAKURA et al., Analytical Biochem., (20040000), vol. 327, pages 233 - 240 | - TAN et al., Anticancer Res., (19960000), vol. 16, pages 3931 - 3936 | - TAN, Protein Express. Purif., (19970000), vol. 9, pages 233 - 245 | - TAN, Anticancer Res., (20070000), vol. 17, pages 3857 - 3860 | - VOLKER SCHELLENBERGERL, Nature Biotech., (20090000), vol. 27, pages 1186 - 1190 | - WARD, Proc, Embo-Alko Workshop on Molecular Biology of Filamentous Fungi, (19890000), pages 119 - 128 | - WAWRZYNCZAKTHORPE, Immunoconjugates, Antibody Conuugates In Radio imaging And Therapy Of Cancer, Oxford University Press, (19870000), vol. 28 | - YANG et al., "PEGylation confers greatly extended half-life and attenuated immunogenicity to recombinant methioninase in primates", AACR, (20040000), pages 6673 - 6678 | - YANG et al., "Pharmacokinetics, methionine depletion, and antigenicity of recombinant methioninase in primates", AACR, (20040000), pages 2131 - 2138 | - YOSHIOKA et al., Cancer Res., (19980000), vol. 58, pages 2583 - 2587 | US19680613013 |