EP2531833 - GAS ACTIVATED CHANGES TO LIGTH ABSORPTION AND EMISSION CHARACTERISTICS FOR SECURITY ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectra Systems Corporation 321 South Main Street Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWANDY, Nabil, M. 80 Beauchamp Drive Saunderstown, RI 02874 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Blaseby, Matthew Peter EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 11740436.8 | 04.02.2011 | WO2011US23767 | Priority number, date | US20100301340P | 04.02.2010 Original published format: US 301340 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011097495 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531833 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, G07D7/12, G01N21/78 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G01N21/783 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (US);
B42D25/29 (US);
G01N1/22 (US);
G01N21/64 (US);
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N21/643 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (US);
G06K7/10544 (US);
G07D7/1205 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1795 (US);
G01N2021/3137 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | G01N21/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | GASAKTIVIERTE ÄNDERUNGEN AN LICHTABSORPTIONS- UND -EMISSIONSEIGENSCHAFTEN FÜR SICHERHEITSPRODUKTE | [2012/50] | English: | GAS ACTIVATED CHANGES TO LIGTH ABSORPTION AND EMISSION CHARACTERISTICS FOR SECURITY ARTICLES | [2012/50] | French: | MODIFICATIONS ACTIVÉES PAR UN GAZ APPORTÉES AUX CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'ABSORPTION ET D'ÉMISSION DE LA LUMIÈRE ASSOCIÉES À DES ARTICLES DE SÉCURITÉ | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 21.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 26.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP20194077.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2242161 (SUNMAN ROBERT PETER) [X] 1-3,7,10 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 4-6,8,9,11-15; | [XI]DE19808652 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,11,12,15 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 17 * * column 6, lines 23-67 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 6 * * figures 1-3,7 *[I] 4-6,8-10,13,14; | [XI]US2009266875 (RUEDIGER SENS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0042] * * figure 1 * [I] 4,8,9,13,14 | International search | [X]WO0038283 (UNIV BROWN RES FOUND [US]); | [Y]US2005109983 (PAI-PARANJAPE VANDITA [US], et al); | [Y]US7089420 (DURST DAVID I [US], et al) |