EP2531327 - FOUR DEGREE OF FREEDOM (4-DOF) SINGLE MODULAR ROBOT UNIT OR JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYLAND, Graham 3089 Catalina Island Road West Sacramento, CA 95691 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Harry 1611 Van Damme Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11740442.6 | 04.02.2011 | WO2011US23776 | Priority number, date | US20100302010P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302010 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011097502 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2531327 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/06, B25J17/00, B25J9/08 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B25J9/08 (EP,US);
B08B9/045 (EP,US);
B25J9/06 (EP,US);
B25J9/065 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20317 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20329 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20341 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | EINZELNE MODULARE ROBOTEREINHEIT ODER GELENK MIT VIER FREIHEITSGRADEN | [2012/50] | English: | FOUR DEGREE OF FREEDOM (4-DOF) SINGLE MODULAR ROBOT UNIT OR JOINT | [2012/50] | French: | UNITÉ OU ARTICULATION ROBOTISÉE À UN SEUL MODULE ET QUATRE DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ (4-DOF) | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 14.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20060095266 (SEJIN IGB CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-12,15 * figure 10 * [I] 13,14; | [X]JPS6034282 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]JP2003103063 (XEROX CORP); | [A]JPH05245784 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH05111885 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]KR20060095266 (SEJIN IGB CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO9901261 (ENGINEERING SERVICES INC [CA]); | [A]US5523662 (GOLDENBERG ANDREW A [CA], et al) |