EP2533804 - ANTIBODY DRUG CONJUGATES (ADC) THAT BIND TO 161P2F10B PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agensys, Inc. 1800 Stewart Street Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Agensys, Inc. 2225 Colorado Boulevard Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORGOV, Michael 2914 Arizona Avenue, Apt 3 Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | 02 /
MORRISON, Robert, Kendall 1044 Yale Street Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | 03 /
JAKOBOVITS, Aya 3135 Hutton Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US | 04 /
GUDAS, Jean 13340 Chalon Road Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | 05 /
AN, Zili 2914 Arizona Avenue, Apt. No. 3 Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2012/51] | 01 /
TORGOV, Michael 2914 Arizona Avenue, Apt 3 Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | ||
02 /
MORRISON, Robert, Kendall 1044 Yale Street Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | |||
03 /
JAKOBOVITS, Aya 3135 Hutton Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US | |||
04 /
GUDAS, Jean 13340 Chalon Road Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | |||
05 /
AN, Zili 2225 Colorado Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | Representative(s) | Bezzubova, Olga, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2012/51] | Höglund, Lars Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11740529.0 | 08.02.2011 | [2018/15] | WO2011US24055 | Priority number, date | US20100302489P | 08.02.2010 Original published format: US 302489 P | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011097627 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533804 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2533804 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07K16/28, A61K39/395, C07K16/30, A61K39/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
A61K47/6811 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
C07K16/28 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6861 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/3038 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/15] | A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K47/55 | ||
Former IPC [2013/46] | A61K39/00, A61K47/48, A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | ||
Former IPC [2012/51] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AN 161P2F10B-PROTEINE BINDENDE ANTIKÖRPER-WIRKSTOFFKONJUGATE (ADC) | [2012/51] | English: | ANTIBODY DRUG CONJUGATES (ADC) THAT BIND TO 161P2F10B PROTEINS | [2012/51] | French: | CONJUGUÉS ANTICORPS-MÉDICAMENTS (ADC) QUI SE LIENT AUX PROTÉINES 161P2F10B | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18162821.5 / EP3395361 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2011 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.02.2011 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03040340 (AGENSYS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]WO2006105488 (AGENSYS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0028] , [0030] , [0115] , [0284] , [0607]; claims 7,18 *; | [Y]WO2008100805 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12* paragraphs [0009] , [0011]; claims 10,20 *; | [Y] - SVETLANA O. DORONINA ET AL, "Enhanced Activity of Monomethylauristatin F through Monoclonal Antibody Delivery: Effects of Linker Technology on Efficacy and Toxicity", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20060101), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1021/bc0502917, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 114 - 124, XP055009264 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 115, column l, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * * Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0502917 | International search | [Y]US2003206905 (JAKOBOVITS AYA [US], et al); | [Y]US2006233794 (LAW CHE-LEUNG [US], et al); | [Y]US2006275211 (JAKOBOVITS AYA [US], et al) | by applicant | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3996345 | US4275149 | US4277437 | US4366241 | US4486414 | US4676980 | US4816567 | US4816444 | US4879278 | US4880935 | WO9007861 | US4970198 | US4975278 | US4978744 | US4986988 | US5076973 | US5079233 | US5122368 | US5138036 | US5410024 | US5504191 | US5521284 | US5530097 | US5545806 | US5554725 | US5569825 | US5585089 | US5599902 | US5606040 | US5622929 | US5624821 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5635483 | US5648260 | US5661016 | US5663149 | US5665860 | US5677425 | US5693762 | US5739116 | WO9816628 | US5767285 | US5773001 | US5780588 | US5824805 | US5869046 | WO9958572 | US6034065 | US6107540 | US6121022 | US6130237 | US6165745 | US6194551 | US6214345 | US6239104 | US6277375 | US6323315 | WO0243478 | WO02088172 | US2003083263 | WO03040340 | US6657103 | WO2004010957 | EP1391213 | US2005009751 | WO2005092380 | US2005238649 | US2006024317 | WO2006034488 | US2006074008 | US7067130 | WO2006105488 | US7226594 | US7279556 | US7405290 | WO2008100805 |