EP2580452 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING A VARIABLE VALVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOGENJI, Yoshiyuki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
TAKIMOTO, Fumito c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Takashi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
HABARA, Shunsuke c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11740985.4 | 09.06.2011 | WO2011IB01649 | Priority number, date | JP20100132814 | 10.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010132814 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011154838 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580452 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580452 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/14 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F01L1/34 (US);
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
F02D41/2461 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN EINES VARIABLEN VENTILSYSTEMS | [2014/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING A VARIABLE VALVE SYSTEM | [2013/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CONTRÔLER UN SYSTÈME DE SOUPAPE VARIABLE | [2014/42] |
Former [2013/16] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES REGELVENTILSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2013/16] | APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION DE SOUPAPE VARIABLE POUR MOTEUR THERMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14168441.5 / EP2799697 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2011 | AL | 18.03.2015 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | IT | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | IE | 09.06.2015 | LU | 09.06.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.06.2011 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 09.06.2011 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.06.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.06.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1669560 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]EP1703091 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] *; | [A]US2006229797 (SAWADA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]WO2007122875 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 1 - line 18 * | by applicant | JP2009216052 |