EP2588639 - METHOD FOR THE SURFACE TREATMENT OF A FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptar France SAS Lieudit le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNA, Pascal 15 avenue des Canadiens F-76300 Sotteville Les Rouen / FR | 02 /
BUSARDO, Denis Chemin du Four F-14510 Gonneville Sur Mer / FR | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 11741624.8 | 01.07.2011 | [2016/36] | WO2011FR51544 | Priority number, date | FR20100002989 | 16.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1002989 | FR20100055343 | 02.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1055343 | [2013/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012001325 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2588639 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588639 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/48 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B65D81/24 (EP,US);
B01J19/085 (US);
C03C23/0055 (EP,US);
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
C08J7/18 (EP,US);
C23C14/48 (EP,US);
H01J37/3171 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0205 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | C23C14/48, A61F9/00, A61L2/16, C08J7/18, H01J37/317, A61J1/00, A61M15/00, B65D1/00, B05B11/00, A61M11/00, C08J7/12, C23C14/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEARBEITUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINES FLUIDPRODUKTS | [2013/19] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SURFACE TREATMENT OF A FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE | [2013/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE. | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 09.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2011 | AL | 07.09.2016 | AT | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | MT | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20060122073 ; | [Y]GB2071673 (INST ZA YADRENI IZSLEDVANIYA I) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, lines 28-6,39,45-48; claims 1-9,18 * * page 2, lines 5-12 *; | [A]US5492763 (BARRY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 9 - column 58 * * the whole document *; | [A]US5520664 (BRICAULT JR RAYMOND J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008141141 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0012] , [0017] , [0048] , [0054] , [0055] *; | [A]FR2917753 (QUERTECH INGENIERIE SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XPLI]WO2010100384 (QUERTECH INGENIERIE [FR], et al) [XP] 1-7 * the whole document * [L] 8 [I] ; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 70, Database accession no. 2007-747865, XP002630000 & KR20060122073 A 20061130 (YANG W D) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - RAGHUVIR SINGH ET AL, "Corrosion degradation and prevention by surface modification of biometallic materials", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20061202), vol. 18, no. 5, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 725 - 751, XP019503689 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - LUKE HANLEY ET AL, "The growth and modification of materials via ion surface processing", SURFACE SCIENCE, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 500, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0039-6028(01)01528-X, ISSN 0039-6028, (20020310), pages 500 - 522, (20010915), XP002622947 [A] 9-19 * page 513, paragraphs 2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-6028(01)01528-X | [A] - RAO GOPAL R ET AL, "Effects of sequential He<+> and Ar<+> implantation on surface properties of polymers", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, WARRENDALE, PA, US, (19961001), vol. 11, no. 10, ISSN 0884-2914, pages 2661 - 2667, XP009123709 [A] 9-19 * the whole document * | [A] - LEE E H ET AL, "Ion Beam application for improved polymer surface properties", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B:BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 74, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0168-583X(93)95070-L, ISSN 0168-583X, (19930402), pages 326 - 330, (20021015), XP002622948 [A] 9-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-583X(93)95070-L | by applicant | DE2830977 | EP0473892 | US5154325 | EP0580460 | EP0644785 | US5433343 | EP0831972 | EP0889757 | US6227413 | EP1169241 | WO2005085491 | - J.F. ZIEGLER, The Stopping and Range of Ions in Matter, PERGAMON PRESS, (1977), vol. 2-6 | - J.P. BIERSACK, L. HAGGMARK, NUCL. INSTR. AND METH., (1980), vol. 174, page 257 |