EP2405669 - DISPLAY DEVICE, SHUTTER DEVICE, SHUTTER CONTROL CIRCUIT, SHUTTER CONTROL METHOD, AND DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Yasuhisa c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Berryman, Robert Jan D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street GB-Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 11742155.2 | 03.02.2011 | WO2011JP52226 | Priority number, date | JP20100027698 | 10.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010027698 | [2012/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011099411 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405669 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04, G02B27/22, G09G5/36 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
G09G3/003 (EP,US);
G02B30/00 (KR);
G02B30/24 (EP,US);
G09G5/003 (EP,US);
G09G5/36 (KR);
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, BLENDENVORRICHTUNG, BLENDENSTEUERSCHALTUNG, BLENDENSTEUERVERFAHREN UND ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2012/02] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE, SHUTTER DEVICE, SHUTTER CONTROL CIRCUIT, SHUTTER CONTROL METHOD, AND DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2012/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF OBTURATEUR, CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE D'OBTURATEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'OBTURATEUR, ET SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2011 | Translation filed | 07.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 27.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6057811 (EDWARDS WILLIAM THOMAS [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,12-14 * figures 1, 3, 4, 5 * * column 3, lines 49-52 * * column 6, lines 15-18 * * column 7, lines 5-8 * [A] 2,4,8-11 [I] 5; | [A]US6791599 (OKADA SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, lines 19-20 * * column 2, lines 29, 31-40, 59-60 *; | [A]US6456432 (LAZZARO GERARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 12, lines 36-42 * | International search | [A]JPH08265863 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS62231578 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [A]JP2001112024 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH08265863 |