EP2535369 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING WATER-ABSORBING RESIN POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA, Sumio c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okinohama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1292 / JP | 02 /
ISHIZAKI, Kunihiko c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okinohama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1292 / JP | 03 /
WADA, Katsuyuki c/o NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO. LTD. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okinohama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1292 / JP | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2021/12] |
Former [2012/51] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11742329.3 | 10.02.2011 | [2021/12] | WO2011JP52945 | Priority number, date | JP20100027202 | 10.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010027202 | [2012/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011099586 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2535369 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535369 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12, B01J20/26, C08J3/24 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
C08J3/245 (EP,US);
B01J2220/68 (EP,US);
C08J2300/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | C08J3/12, B01J20/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN WASSERABSORBIERENDES HARZPULVER | [2012/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING WATER-ABSORBING RESIN POWDER | [2012/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE POUDRE DE RÉSINE ABSORBANT L'EAU | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2012 | Translation filed | 09.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2011 | AL | 24.03.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | DK | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | ES | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | IT | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | MT | 24.03.2021 | NL | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SE | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.02.2011 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 10.02.2011 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.02.2011 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
DK | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
NL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SE | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1422257 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0099]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1426402 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0157]; example -; claim - *; | [XD]WO2004069293 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [XD] 1-7,9-15 * page 8, line 8 - page 12, line 15 * * page 17, line 13 - page 60, line 22; examples 11-17,21; claim - *; | [X]WO2005056177 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * page 5, line 20 - page 40, line 11; example -; claim - *; | [XDP]EP2189478 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [XDP] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] - [0044]; examples 13,14; claim - *; | [XP]EP2258749 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [XP] 1-7,9-15* paragraphs [0006] - [0147]; example -; claim - *; | [E]EP2479195 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [E] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [001O] - [0172]; example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JP2004197087 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [Y]JP2006198529 (TECHNO RYOWA LTD); | [X]WO2009119756 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4734478 | US4755562 | US4783510 | US4824901 | EP0349240 | US4893999 | US5140076 | EP0534228 | US5206205 | EP0603292 | US5409771 | US5422405 | US5610208 | US5669894 | US5672633 | US6071976 | US6164455 | US6228930 | US6239230 | US6241928 | US6254990 | US6265488 | US6297319 | US6372852 | US6472478 | US6503979 | US6514615 | US6559239 | US6605673 | US6620899 | US6620889 | US6657015 | US6710141 | US6720389 | US6809158 | US2004240316 | JP2004345804 | JP2004352941 | US2005016393 | US2005029352 | US2005048221 | US2005070671 | US6906159 | US2005215734 | US2005288182 | US6987151 | US2006034806 | US2006057389 | US2006074816 | US2006073969 | WO2006082188 | WO2006082189 | WO2006082197 | US7091253 | US7098284 | WO2006111402 | WO2006111403 | WO2006111404 | US7157141 | US7183456 | US2007078231 | US2007106013 | WO2007065840 | US2007149760 | US2007161759 | EP1824910 | WO2007104657 | WO2007104673 | WO2007104676 | WO2007121037 | US2007293632 | US7312278 | WO2008009843 | WO2008009842 | US2008037672 | US2008037673 | US2008037675 | WO2008037672 | WO2008037675 | US7378453 | US2008123477 | US7473739 | WO2009028568 | US2010032694 |