EP2533862 - BREATHING GAS SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invacare Corporation One Invacare Way Elyria, OH 44035-4190 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Invacare Corporation One Invacare Way Elyria, OH 44036-2125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITESEL, Mary, B. 18555 Mennell Road Grafton OH 44044 / US | 02 /
FABIAN, Martin 31426 Walker Road Bay Village OH 44140 / US | 03 /
HODOS, Valentine, Antonio 13904 Highlandview Avenue Cleveland OH 44135 / US | 04 /
KOLECKI, Joseph, M. 10310 Manoa Avenue Brooklyn OH 44144 / US | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 11742678.3 | 08.02.2011 | WO2011US24005 | Priority number, date | US20100302906P | 09.02.2010 Original published format: US 302906 P | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011100223 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533862 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A62B7/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
F04B39/121 (EP,US);
F04B53/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | ATEMGASVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/51] | English: | BREATHING GAS SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2012/51] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ RESPIRATOIRE | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 27.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005103341 (DEANE GEOFFREY F [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0123] - [0125] *; | [IY]US2003167924 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6,7,13,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0018] , [0024] , [0025] , [0029]; figures 2-10 * [Y] 3-5,8-12,14,16,17; | [Y]US2009065007 (WILKINSON WILLIAM R [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0008]; figure 21c *; | [Y]US2007261182 (FERNANDEZ-GRANDIZO MARTINEZ JE [MX], et al) [Y] 16,17 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0030]; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]US2008105258 (DEANE GEOFFREY F [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0081]; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US7156903 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US]) [Y] 3-5,14 * column 1, lines 50-51; figures 1A-B,2A-F * * column 3, lines 31-48 *; | [Y]US2003200865 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US], et al) [Y] 9-12,14 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US4511377 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US]) [Y] 9-12,14 * column 2, lines 23-30; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5524321 (WEAVER JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 9-12 * column 3, lines 11-15; figures 4,8 * * column 5, lines 15-20 *; | [Y]US4342573 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R, et al) [Y] 14 * figure 3 * | International search | [X]US2003167924 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US], et al); | [Y]US2009065007 (WILKINSON WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [Y]US2007261182 (FERNANDEZ-GRANDIZO MARTINEZ JE [MX], et al); | [Y]US2008105258 (DEANE GEOFFREY F [US], et al); | [Y]US7156903 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US]); | [Y]US2003200865 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US], et al); | [Y]US4511377 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US]); | [Y]US5524321 (WEAVER JAMES M [US], et al); | [Y]US4342573 (MCCOMBS NORMAN R, et al) | by applicant | US5988165 | US6923180 | US2007065301 | US20090234330 | US20100302906 |