EP2534792 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR INTER-DIAMETER-MESSAGE PROCESSOR ROUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tekelec, Inc. 5200 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Tekelec, Inc. 5200 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACE, Donald, E. 3127 Buttercup Lane Evergreen, CO 80439 / US | 02 /
KANODE, Mark, Edward 3204 Colby Chase Drive Apex, NC 27539 / US | 03 /
SPRAGUE, David, Michael 14252 Wyndfield Circle Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 04 /
CRAIG, Jeffrey, Alan 5 Summertime Court Durham, NC 27707 / US | 05 /
KARMARKAR, Kedar, Kashinath C/o Sanjay Revalkar Flat No 6 Meghali Co-op Hsg Society Damle Path Off Law College Road Erandwana Pune 411004 / IN | 06 /
TOMAR, Mahesh 216 Union Ridge Drive Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/30] |
Former [2014/08] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2013/45] | de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/51] | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11742894.6 | 11.02.2011 | [2018/30] | WO2011US24588 | Priority number, date | US20100304310P | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 304310 P | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011100587 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2534792 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2534792 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/703, H04L12/725, // H04L12/26 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H04L63/0892 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/028 (CN,US);
H04L45/304 (EP,US);
H04L45/34 (CN,US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L43/0805 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | H04L12/733, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2012/51] | H04L12/28, H04L29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN FÜR PROZESSOR-ROUTING ZWISCHEN DIAMETER-NACHRICHTEN | [2018/10] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR INTER-DIAMETER-MESSAGE PROCESSOR ROUTING | [2012/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR POUR ROUTAGE ENTRE PROCESSEURS DE MESSAGES DIAMETER | [2012/51] |
Former [2012/51] | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN FÜR PROZESSOR-ROUTING ZWISCHEN DURCHMESSER-NACHRICHTEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 03.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2011 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | IE | 11.02.2019 | LU | 11.02.2019 | MT | 11.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.02.2011 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
MT | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
MT | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
MT | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 11.02.2019 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 11.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003225938 (GLASCO DAVID BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0 27] - [0038] *; | [I]US2009080440 (BALYAN AVNEESH SINGH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0056] * * figures 1,4,6 *; | [A]WO2009070179 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0004] - [0014] *; | [I]WO2009128837 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 12 - page 10, line 9 *; | [A] - TSOU HUAWEI V FAJARDO TARI J KORHONEN TELIASONERA T ASVEREN SONUS T, "Diameter Routing Extensions; draft-tsou-dime-base-routing-ext-04.txt", DIAMETER ROUTING EXTENSIONS; DRAFT-TSOU-DIME-BASE-ROUTING-EXT-04.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20080729), no. 4, XP015060029 [A] 1-15 * sections 1.1, 1.2.1, 3.1 to 3.6 * | International search | [A]EP1134939 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]US2001024443 (ALRIKSSON FREDRIK [SE], et al) | by applicant | US2009080440 | WO2009128837 |