EP2533683 - METHOD OF CHARACTERIZING THE PATHOLOGICAL RESPONSE OF TISSUE TO A TREATMANT PLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphinus Medical Technologies, Inc. 46701 Commerce Center Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURIC, Nebojsa 3819 Marr Court Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US | 02 /
LITTRUP, Peter, John 951 Timberlake Drive Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Stanners, David Ralph, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Stanners, David Ralph, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11742965.4 | 14.02.2011 | WO2011US24765 | Priority number, date | US20100304256P | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 304256 P | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011100691 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533683 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/4848 (EP);
A61B5/4312 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG DER PATHOLOGISCHEN REAKTION EINES GEWEBES AUF EINEN BEHANDLUNGSPLAN | [2012/51] | English: | METHOD OF CHARACTERIZING THE PATHOLOGICAL RESPONSE OF TISSUE TO A TREATMANT PLAN | [2012/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CARACTÉRISATION DE RÉPONSE PATHOLOGIQUE DE TISSU À UN TRAITEMENT | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 17.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008294027 (FRINKING PETER [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0073] *; | [X]US2008281205 (NAGHAVI MORTEZA [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0117] * | [X] - SINGH SEEMA ET AL, "Color Doppler ultrasound as an objective assessment tool for chemotherapeutic response in advanced breast cancer.", BREAST CANCER (TOKYO, JAPAN) 2005, (2005), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 1340-6868, pages 45 - 51, XP002698852 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2325/jbcs.12.45 | [X] - B. BANIHASHEMI ET AL, "Ultrasound Imaging of Apoptosis in Tumor Response: Novel Preclinical Monitoring of Photodynamic Therapy Effects", CANCER RESEARCH, (20081015), vol. 68, no. 20, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-0006, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 8590 - 8596, XP055066759 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-0006 | [X] - YAMAN C ET AL, "Three-dimensional ultrasound to assess the response to treatment in gynecological malignancies", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20050501), vol. 97, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YGYNO.2005.01.012, ISSN 0090-8258, pages 665 - 668, XP004879600 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygyno.2005.01.012 | International search | [A]WO2005057467 (SUBQIVIEW INC [US], et al); | [A]US2005260745 (DOMANSKY KAREL [US], et al); | [A]US2006085049 (CORY PHILLIP C [US], et al); | [Y]US2008275344 (GLIDE-HURST CARRI K [US], et al); | [X]US2009035218 (ROSS BRIAN D [US], et al) |