EP2536822 - MEDIA, KITS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE MICROPROPAGATION OF BAMBOO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Provitro Biosciences LLC 17618 Dunbar Road Mount Vernon, WA 98273 / US | [2013/20] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Booshoot LLC 17618 Dunbar Road Mount Vernon, WA 98273 / US | ||
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states The Red Triangle, LLC 17618 Dunbar Road Mount Vernon, Washington 98273 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURR, Randall, W. 19698 Montpiliar Place Mount Vernon, WA 98274 / US | 02 /
HEINRICHER, Jackie 5722 Campbell Lake Road Anacortes, WA 98221 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11743015.7 | 15.02.2011 | WO2011US24936 | Priority number, date | US20100304681P | 15.02.2010 Original published format: US 304681 P | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011100762 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2536822 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, A01N43/90 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
C12N5/0025 (EP,US);
A01H4/002 (EP,US);
A01H4/005 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N43/82 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | MEDIEN, KITS, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MIKROVERMEHRUNG VON BAMBUS | [2012/52] | English: | MEDIA, KITS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE MICROPROPAGATION OF BAMBOO | [2012/52] | French: | SUPPORTS, KITS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA MICROPROPAGATION DU BAMBOU | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 29.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - MADHULIKA SINGH ET AL, "Thidiazuron-induced Shoot Multiplication and Plant Regeneration in Bamboo (Dendrocalamus strictus Nees)", JOURNAL OF PLANT BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20010701), vol. 10, pages 133 - 137, XP055068097 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF03263122 | [Y] - STEFAAN P. O. WERBROUCK ET AL, "Meta-topolin, an alternative to benzyladenine in tissue culture?", PHYSIOLOGIA PLANTARUM, (19961001), vol. 98, no. 2, doi:10.1034/j.1399-3054.1996.980210.x, ISSN 0031-9317, pages 291 - 297, XP055040937 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-3054.1996.980210.x | [Y] - CARMEN VALERO-ARACAMA ET AL, "Substitution of benzyladenine with meta-topolin during shoot multiplication increases acclimatization of difficult and easy-to-acclimatize sea oats (Uniola paniculata L.) genotypes", PLANT GROWTH REGULATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20091103), vol. 60, no. 1, ISSN 1573-5087, pages 43 - 49, XP019769196 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2002086425 (GIELIS JOHAN [BE], et al); | [A]US2004143868 (AINLEY MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2004221506 (TISSERAT BRENT H [US]); | [Y]US2009205066 (BROWSE JOHN [US], et al); | [Y] - BAIRU ET AL., "Optimizing the micropropagation protocol for the endangered Aloe polyphylla: can meta-topolin and its derivatives serve as replacement for benzyladenine and zeatin?", PLANT CELL TISS ORGAN CULT, (2007), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1007/s11240-007-9233-4, pages 15 - 23, XP019534274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11240-007-9233-4 | [A] - RAMANAYAKE ET AL., "In vitro shoot proliferation and enhancement of rooting for the large-scale propagation of yellow bamboo (Bambusa vulgaris ''Striata'').", SCIENT. HORTICULT., (2006), vol. 110, doi:doi:10.1016/j.scienta.2006.06.016, pages 109 - 113, XP024983700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.scienta.2006.06.016 | [A] - ESCALONA ET AL., "The effect of meta-topolin on plantain propagation using a temporary immersion I bioreactor.", INFOMUSA., (2004), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 28 - 30 |