EP2601072 - POWER RAIL ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furrer + Frey AG Thunstrasse 35 Postfach 182 3000 Bern 6 / CH | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURRER, Beat Riedweg 21 CH-3012 Bern / CH | 02 /
GILGEN, Marc Egelgasse 64 CH-3006 Bern / CH | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | von Bülow, Tam Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | von Bülow, Tam Rotbuchenstrasse 6 81547 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11743189.0 | 20.07.2011 | WO2011EP03633 | Priority number, date | DE20101033451 | 05.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010033451 | [2013/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012016640 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2601072 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2601072 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60M1/20, B60M1/24, B60M1/30 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
B60M1/307 (EP);
B60M1/20 (EP);
B60M1/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2013/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMSCHIENENANORDNUNG | [2013/24] | English: | POWER RAIL ARRANGEMENT | [2013/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE RAIL CONDUCTEUR | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 05.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2011 | AL | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | HR | 20.05.2015 | IT | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MK | 20.05.2015 | MT | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | RS | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | SM | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | IE | 20.07.2015 | LU | 20.07.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | NO | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006100267 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * page 4, line 18 - page 4, line 31; figure 1 *; | [X]DE2046740 (ELIN UNION AG) [X] 1 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE565331 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202009013786U | DE202004009416U |