EP2606644 - VIDEO SIGNAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Streamworks International S.A. 63-65 Rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEACOCK, Robert, Brown 24 Giralda Close London E16 6SZ / GB | 02 /
ISMAEL-MIA, Abdur-Rehman 35 Hillside Cottages London SE18 3RL / GB | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11743243.5 | 15.08.2011 | WO2011EP64041 | Priority number, date | EP20100391001 | 17.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10391001 | US20100876887 | 07.09.2010 Original published format: US 876887 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022719 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606644 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/46 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/162 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | VIDEOSIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [2013/26] | English: | VIDEO SIGNAL PROCESSING | [2013/26] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX VIDÉO | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 04.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5327235 (RICHARDS JOHN W [GB]) [A] 1-21 * figure 7 * * figure 8 * * figure 9 * * figures 11A,11B ** figures 12A, 12B *; | [XAI]WO9617478 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-11,15-17 * page 6, line 17 - page 12, line 4; figures 2,3 * * page 13, line 35 - page 14, line 35; figures 5,6 * [A] 6,12,13 [I] 14,18-21; | [A]US5742343 (HASKELL BARIN GEOFFRY [US], et al) [A] 8,15,16 * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 8; figure 1 * * column 7, line 54 - column 7, line 62 * * column 9, line 18 - column 10, line 49; figure 18 *; | [A]US6873368 (YU HAOPING [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0046]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056]; figure 4 *; | [XI]WO2008011502 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,15-17,20,21 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056]; figure 8 * [I] 5,13,14,18,19; | [A]WO2010009540 (HEADPLAY BARBADOS INC [BB], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010083303 (REDEI JANOS [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] *; | [XI] - WENXIAN YANG ET AL, "Improved Interlayer Prediction for Scalable Video Coding", 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 15-20 APRIL 2007 HONOLULU, HI, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070415), ISBN 978-1-4244-0727-9, pages I - 649, XP031462945 [X] 1-4,7-10,15-17 * the whole document * [I] 14,18-21 | [A] - NGO C, "IMAGE RESIZING AND ENHANCED DIGITAL VIDEO COMPRESSION", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (19960104), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0012-7515, pages 145 - 148,150,1, XP000554477 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - RIOUL O, "A DISCRETE-TIME MULTIRESOLUTION THEORY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/78.229891, (19930801), vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 2591 - 2606, XP000392952 [A] 1-17 * page 2595, column LC - page 2596, column LC, paragraph V; figure 3 * * page 2596, column LC - page 2598, column LC, paragraph VI; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.229891 | by applicant | WO9617478 | US5742343 | WO2008011502 | WO2010009540 | US2010083303 | - Handbook of Image & Video Processing |