EP2590772 - MIG/MAG WELDING WITH ROTATIVE ARC FOR CARBON STEEL AND AR/HE/O2 GAS MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/20] | MIG/MAG WELDING OF STEEL TO CARBON WITH ROTARY ARC AND GASEOUS MIXTURE OF AR/HE/O2 | ||
[2018/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISKUP, Laurent 26 rue Pierre Eugene Boyer Apt du Château F-60590 Serifontaine / FR | 02 /
BOUDET, Gilles 79bis Avenue des Coutayes F-78570 Andresy / FR | 03 /
PLANCKAERT, Jean-Pierre 2 Impasse de la Fontaine F-60240 Monneville / FR | 04 /
SAEZ, Michel 2 Allée de la Sablière F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A. Service Brevets & Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2018/22] |
Former [2013/20] | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A., Service Brevets & Marques, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11743286.4 | 04.07.2011 | [2018/22] | WO2011FR51560 | Priority number, date | FR20100055493 | 07.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1055493 | [2013/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012004498 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2590772 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2590772 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/02, B23K9/028, B23K9/08, B23K35/38 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
B23K9/0216 (EP,US);
B23K9/173 (US);
B23K35/383 (EP,US);
B23K9/028 (EP,US);
B23K9/08 (EP,US);
B23K2101/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIG/MAG-SCHWEISSEN MIT EINEM DREHENDEN LICHTBOGEN FÜR C-STAHL UND AR/HE/O2 GASMISCHUNG | [2018/01] | English: | MIG/MAG WELDING WITH ROTATIVE ARC FOR CARBON STEEL AND AR/HE/O2 GAS MIXTURE | [2018/01] | French: | SOUDAGE MIG/MAG DE L'ACIER AU CARBONE AVEC ARC ROTATIF ET MÉLANGE GAZEUX AR/HE/O2 | [2013/20] |
Former [2013/20] | MIG-/MAG-SCHWEISSEN VON KOHLENSTOFFSTAHL MIT DREHLICHTBOGEN UND AR/HE/O2-GASMISCHUNG | ||
Former [2013/20] | MIG/MAG WELDING OF STEEL TO CARBON WITH ROTARY ARC AND GASEOUS MIXTURE OF AR/HE/O2 | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 19.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2011 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | IE | 04.07.2018 | LU | 04.07.2018 | FR | 30.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | GB | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | DE | 01.02.2019 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.07.2011 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.07.2011 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
FR | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
DE | 01.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]AU461775B (THE COMMONWEALTH INDUSTRIAL GASES LTD) [X] 1-7 * page 4 - page 5 *; | [I]DE4429228 (LINDE AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 41; claim 1 *; | [I]DE19704513 (LINDE AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - line 8; claims 1,5 *; | [XI]EP1707296 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0027] * [I] 10-13; | [A]DE102007013802 (PANGAS [CH]) [A] 9 * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]EP2042256 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0024] *; | [AD]EP2078580 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [AD] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | EP0857534 | EP2078580 |