EP2593325 - METHOD FOR SAFETY-DEPENDENT DISCONNECTION OF AN ELECTRICAL POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD. 428-5 Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 446-577 / KR | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIEG, Berengar Brennerstraße 59 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
HEYL, Andreas Hoher Pfad 21 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Bee, Joachim, et al Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Wernerstrasse 51 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Bee, Joachim, et al c/o Robert Bosch GmbH, C/IPE Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11743787.1 | 06.07.2011 | WO2011EP61382 | Priority number, date | DE20101031456 | 16.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010031456 | [2013/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012007329 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593325 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L3/04 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B60L3/003 (EP,US);
B60L3/0038 (EP);
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L3/0061 (EP);
B60L3/0069 (EP);
B60L3/0084 (EP);
B60L3/0092 (EP);
B60L3/04 (EP);
H02H1/0061 (EP);
H02H3/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERHEITSBEDINGTEN ABSCHALTUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN NETZES | [2013/21] | English: | METHOD FOR SAFETY-DEPENDENT DISCONNECTION OF AN ELECTRICAL POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2013/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COUPURE DE SÉCURITÉ D'UN RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 03.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1153787 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US7084361 (BOWES CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 27 - column 1, line 42 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 22 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 16 ** figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO2009112165 (LEONI BORDNETZ SYS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 7 * * claims 3-5,7-13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2010050858 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 22 - page 5, line 39 * * claims 1,7 * * figures 1-3 * |