EP2600889 - ANTI-LA ANTIBODIES AND THEIR USE FOR IMMUNOTARGETING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMoaB Monoclonals GmbH Tatzberg 47 01307 Dresden / DE | [2017/12] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states GEMoaB Monoclonals GmbH Fiedlerstrasse 36 01307 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Mommsenstrasse 11 01062 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Michael Dingesweg 4 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2013/24] | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11743999.2 | 05.08.2011 | [2017/48] | WO2011EP63539 | Priority number, date | DE20101039018 | 06.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010039018 | [2013/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012017082 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2600889 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2600889 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-LA ANTIKÖRPER UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ZUM IMMUNOTARGETING | [2013/24] | English: | ANTI-LA ANTIBODIES AND THEIR USE FOR IMMUNOTARGETING | [2013/24] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-LA ET UTILISATION POUR UN IMMUNOCIBLAGE | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 07.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2011 | AL | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | ES | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | IT | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | MT | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | AT | 05.08.2018 | IE | 05.08.2018 | LU | 05.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 05.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 05.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 05.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 05.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | DK | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2005136050 (KUFER PETER [DE], et al) [YD] 1-3,6-14 * paragraph [0054]; claims 1,15 *; | [A] - BAEUERLE PATRICK A ET AL, "Bispecific T-cell engaging antibodies for cancer therapy.", CANCER RESEARCH 15 JUN 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19509221, (20090615), vol. 69, no. 12, ISSN 1538-7445, pages 4941 - 4944, XP002665118 [A] 1-3,6-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-09-0547 | [AD] - BAEUERLE PATRICK A ET AL, "BiTE: Teaching antibodies to engage T-cells for cancer therapy", CURRENT OPINION IN MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS, THOMSON REUTERS (SCIETIFIC) LTD, (20090201), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 2040-3445, pages 22 - 30, XP009151509 [AD] 1-3,6-14 | [AD] - BARGOU RALF ET AL, "Tumor regression in cancer patients by very low doses of a T cell-engaging antibody", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20080815), vol. 321, no. 5891, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1158545, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 974 - 977, XP002615656 [AD] 1-3,6-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1158545 | [YD] - AL-EJEH F ET AL, "The La Autoantigen Is a Malignancy-Associated Cell Death Target That is Induced by DNA-Damaging Drugs", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20070915), vol. 13, no. 18, SUPPL, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0922, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 5509S - 5518S, XP008105261 [YD] 1-3,6-14 * Abstract * Introduction * Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0922 | [YD] - AL-EJEH F ET AL, "In vivo Targeting of Dead Tumor Cells in a Murine Tumor Model Using a Monoclonal Antibody Specific for the La Autoantigen", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20070915), vol. 13, no. 18, SUPPL, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0964, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 5519S - 5527S, XP008105259 [YD] 1-3,6-14 * Introduction * Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0964 | [A] - BACHMANN M ET AL, "Translocation of the nuclear autoantigen La to the cell surface of herpes simplex virus type 1 infected cells.", AUTOIMMUNITY 1992 LNKD- PUBMED:1617103, (1992), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0891-6934, pages 37 - 45, XP009154578 [A] 1-3,6-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/08916939209146128 | Examination | - KORISTKA STEFANIE ET AL, "Retargeting of regulatory T cells to surface-inducible autoantigen La/SS-B", JOURNAL OF AUTOIMMUNITY, LONDON, GB, (20130122), vol. 42, doi:10.1016/J.JAUT.2013.01.002, ISSN 0896-8411, pages 105 - 116, XP028531549 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaut.2013.01.002 | - WANG W W ET AL, "Antigen targeting to dendritic cells with bispecific antibodies", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 306, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, (20051130), pages 80 - 92, (20051130), XP027659256 | - SCHMITZ MARC ET AL, "Tumoricidal potential of native blood dendritic cells: Direct tumor cell killing and activation of NK cell-mediated cytotoxicity", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20050401), vol. 174, no. 7, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4127 - 4134, XP002629625 | - PROSKURYAKOV SERGEY Y ET AL, "Mechanisms of tumor cell necrosis.", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN JAN 2010, (201001), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 1873-4286, pages 56 - 68 | - B J Kroesen ET AL, "Bispecific antibodies for treatment of cancer in experimental animal models and man", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (19980101), vol. 31, doi:10.1016/S0169-409X(97)00096-3, pages 105 - 129, XP055299943 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(97)00096-3 | - CHAMES PATRICK ET AL, "Bispecific antibodies for cancer therapy. The light at the end of the tunnel?", MABS, LANDES BIOSCIENCE, US, (20091101), vol. 1, no. 6, doi:10.4161/MABS.1.6.10015, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 539 - 547, XP002688758 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.1.6.10015 | - GONZALEZ S ET AL, "NKG2D ligands: key targets of the immune response", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER LTD. * TRENDS JOURNALS, GB, vol. 29, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.IT.2008.04.007, ISSN 1471-4906, (20080801), pages 397 - 403, (20080703), XP023181111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2008.04.007 | - KUROKI MASAHIDE ET AL, "RE-TARGETING OF CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES AND/OR NATURAL KILLER CELLS TO CEA-EXPRESSING TUMOR CELLS WITH ANTI-CEA ANTIBODY ACTIVITY", ANTICANCER RESEARCH - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND TREAT, INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ANTICANCER RESEARCH, GR, (20051101), vol. 25, no. 6A, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 3725 - 3732, XP009077768 | - MORETTA A ET AL, "ACTIVATING RECEPTORS AND CORECEPTORS INVOLVED IN HUMAN NATURAL KILLER CELL-MEDIATED CYTOLYSIS", ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOL, ANNUAL REVIEWS INC, US, (20010101), vol. 19, doi:10.1146/ANNUREV.IMMUNOL.19.1.197, ISSN 0732-0582, pages 197 - 223, XP008016880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.19.1.197 | - PEIPP M ET AL, "Bispecific antibodies targeting cancer cells", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, PORTLAND PRESS LTD, GB, (20020101), vol. 30, doi:10.1042/BST0300507, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 507 - 511, XP002981328 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST0300507 | - Raja Rajalingam, "Human diversity of killer cell immunoglobulin-like receptors and disease", The Korean Journal of Hematology, (20110101), vol. 46, no. 4, doi:10.5045/kjh.2011.46.4.216, ISSN 1738-7949, page 216, XP055386149 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5045/kjh.2011.46.4.216 | by applicant | US5457029 | US4751181 | US4784942 | WO2008043148 | US2005136050 | - SLE, MATTIOLI, M., REICHLIN, M., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1974), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 421 - 29 | - LSPAUGH, M. A., TAN, E. M., J CLIN INVEST, (1975), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 1067 - 73 | - GOTTLIEB, E. ET AL., EMBO J, (1989), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 841 - 50 | - CHAMBERS ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 18043 - 18051 | - MCNEILAGE ET AL., J CLIN. LAB. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 15, pages 1 - 17 | - CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 62, pages 685 - 695 | - ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1999), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 199 - 209 | - CHAN EK ET AL., J EXP MED., (1987), vol. 166, no. 6, pages 1627 - 40 | - BACHMANN ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (1990), vol. 191, pages 171 - 180 | - AUTOIMMUNITY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 99 - 107 | - AUTOIMMUNITY, (1992), vol. 12, pages 37 - 45 | - SMITH PR ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS., (1985), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 63 - 76 | - MAMULA MJ, J IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 143, no. 9, pages 2923 - 8 | - OFFEN D ET AL., J AUTOIMMUN., (1990), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 701 - 13 | - BACHMANN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 7770 - 7774 | - MAMULA ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 143, no. 9, pages 2923 - 2928 | - LA CARMO-FONSECA ET AL., EXPCELLRES, (1989), vol. 185, no. 1, pages 73 - 85 | - TRÖSTER ET AL., J AUTOIMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 825 - 842 | - PRUIJN ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 232, pages 611 - 619 | - TRAN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2002), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 202 - 208 | - AL EJEH ET AL., NUCL MED BIOL, (2009), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 395 - 402 | - AL-EJEH F ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 5509S - 5518S | - AL-EJEH F ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 5519S - 5527S | - AL-EJEH F ET AL., PLOS ONE., (2009), vol. 4, no. 2, page E4630 | - AL-EJEH F ET AL., PLOS ONE., (2009), vol. 4, no. 2, page E4558 | - P. A. BAEUERLE, "BiTE: Teaching antibodies to engage T cells for cancer therapy", CURR OPIN MOL THER, (2009), vol. 11, pages 22 - 30, XP009151509 | - R. BARGOU, "Tumor regression in cancer patients by very low doses of a T cell-engaging antibody", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1158545, pages 974 - 977, XP002615656 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1158545 | - K. BRISCHWEIN, "MT110: a novel bispecific single-chain antibody construct with high efficacy in eradicating established tumors", MOL IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molimm.2005.07.034, pages 1129 - 1143, XP025037228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2005.07.034 |