EP2537049 - ESTIMATING INTERNAL MULTIPLES IN SEISMIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geco Technology B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ S'Gravenhage / NL | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTNES, Einar 12035 Terraza Cove Lane Houston, Texas 77041 / US | 02 /
HSU, Shih-Ying 8300 El Mundo Street Apt. 403 Houston, Texas 77054 / US | 03 /
RAMIREZ-PEREZ, Adriana Citlali 12035 Terraza Cove Lane Houston, Texas 77041 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11745228.4 | 17.02.2011 | WO2011US25255 | Priority number, date | US20100707266 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: US 707266 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011103297 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2537049 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/30, G01V1/38, G06F19/00, G06F17/00 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
G01V1/36 (EP,US);
G01V2210/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG DER INTERNEN VIELFACHER IN SEISMISCHEN DATEN | [2012/52] | English: | ESTIMATING INTERNAL MULTIPLES IN SEISMIC DATA | [2012/52] | French: | ESTIMATION DE RÉFLEXIONS MULTIPLES INTERNES DANS DES DONNÉES SISMIQUES | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 05.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4935904 (CHAMBERS RONALD E [US], et al); | [A]US5757723 (WEGLEIN ARTHUR BENJAMI [US], et al); | [A]US7167175 (KELLER ALEXANDER [DE]); | [A]US7453765 (IKELLE LUC T [US]) |