EP2591512 - MONITORING ASSEMBLIES AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micropatent B.V. Bornerbroeksestraat 459B 7609 PK Almelo / NL | [2015/11] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Micropelt GmbH Emmy-Noether-Strasse 2 79110 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NURNUS, Joachim Im Kleegärtle 7 79395 Neuenburg / DE | 02 /
VOLKERT, Fritz Bündtenweg 40 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Staroske, Sandro Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11745715.0 | 08.07.2011 | WO2011EP61636 | Priority number, date | DE20102015650U | 18.11.2010 Original published format: DE 202010015650 U | DE20101031135 | 08.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010031135 | [2013/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012004389 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2591512 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/00, G07C3/04 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
G07C3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSANORDNUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN EINER VORRICHTUNG | [2013/20] | English: | MONITORING ASSEMBLIES AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A DEVICE | [2013/20] | French: | INSTALLATION DE SURVEILLANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN DISPOSITIF | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.04.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2014/47] | 02.02.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2014/51] | 01.04.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2014/51] | Cited in | International search | [I]GB2027902 (SECR SOCIAL SERVICE BRIT); | [A]US5705770 (OGASAWARA KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2005116780 (ENDO TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [I]WO2006033072 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]DE202006017151U (RUBROEDER KLAUS [DE]) | by applicant | DE19845104 |