EP2603567 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ADHESIVE TAPE HAVING A PROTRUDING LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Tesa SE Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACH, Michael Johanniskrautweg 1 22549 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
EHLERS, Bruce, Dirk Jevenstedter Str. 176 22547 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
GABRIEL, Markus König-Heinrich-Weg 13 22459 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
FRÖHLICH, Christian Salzweg 29 C 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 11745742.4 | 01.08.2011 | WO2011EP63226 | Priority number, date | DE20101039299 | 13.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010039299 | DE20111017689 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011017689 | [2013/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012019938 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2603567 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2603567 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C09J7/403 (EP,KR,US);
B32B38/10 (US);
B65H35/0013 (KR);
C09J7/20 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J7/38 (KR);
Y10T156/1067 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1075 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1077 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1087 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1089 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1092 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1097 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1471 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KLEBEBANDS MIT ÜBERSTEHENDEM LINER | [2013/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ADHESIVE TAPE HAVING A PROTRUDING LINER | [2013/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN RUBAN ADHÉSIF COMPORTANT UN MATÉRIAU DE SÉPARATION SAILLANT | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 28.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2011 | AL | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | RS | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.08.2011 | |
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.08.2011 | |
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4418105 (STRATTON JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0928822 (MILLAN CALVO FERNANDO [ES]) [A] 1-5* figure 1 *; | [A]US2003113500 (INGERSLEW JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | - "Coating Equipment", DONATAS SATAS, Handbook of Pressure Sensitive Adhesive Technology, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD, pages 767 - 808 |