EP2619515 - APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING ORGANIC WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAL S.r.l. Via Trieste 81 21023 Besozzo Va / IT | [2016/29] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states SAL S.r.l. Via Trieste 81 21023 Besozzo Va / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTONA, Paolo Via Illirico 1/b I-20133 Milano / IT | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Simino, Massimo Cuccia & Simino S.r.l. Corso di Porta Romana, 23 20122 Milano / IT | [2016/29] |
Former [2013/31] | Faggioni, Carlo Maria Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11745748.1 | 05.08.2011 | [2016/29] | WO2011EP63569 | Priority number, date | WO2010IT00363 | 09.08.2010 Original published format: PCT/IT2010/000363 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019977 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619515 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2619515 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F26B9/00, F26B11/14 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
F26B9/003 (EP);
F26B11/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BIOMÜLL | [2013/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING ORGANIC WASTE | [2013/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉCHETS ORGANIQUES | [2016/07] |
Former [2013/31] | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DES DÉCHETS ORGANIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 17.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees MC, DK, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 10.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 10.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 10.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2011 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | IE | 05.08.2016 | LU | 05.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | FR | 20.09.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | GB | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | DE | 01.03.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 20.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GB | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 20.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GB | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 20.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GB | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 20.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GB | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 20.09.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GB | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
DE | 01.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0740012 (CANDY SPA [IT]); | [A]WO03016806 (RETEC CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AD]WO2007029954 (KANG DAE-EUN [KR], et al); | [AD]WO2008150059 (CHOI DONGGAK [KR]) | by applicant | US5534042 | US5925321 | US2003036190 | WO2007029954 | WO2008150059 |