EP2605685 - PULL-OUT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16 32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄHRLING, Peter Sperberstr. 11 32257 Bünde / DE | 02 /
BUDDE, Sven Auf dem Nettelacker 4 32312 Lübbecke / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11746534.4 | 18.08.2011 | WO2011EP64244 | Priority number, date | DE20101037097 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010037097 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022788 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605685 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/10, F16C29/00, F24C15/16 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
F24C15/168 (EP,KR,US);
A47B88/493 (EP,KR,US);
F16C29/005 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | A47B88/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG | [2013/26] | English: | PULL-OUT GUIDE | [2013/26] | French: | GLISSIÈRE DE TIROIR | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3588198 (STEWART EDWARD C, et al) [X] 1,2,10* abstract *; | [X]DE202009001963U (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * figures 2,14,15 * | Examination | DE202005014127U | DE202005019749U | GB2453326 | DE202008012997U | EP2186438 |