EP2541312 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATA, Yoshiki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22 - 22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545 - 8522 / JP | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2013/01] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11747110.2 | 24.01.2011 | WO2011JP51172 | Priority number, date | JP20100038752 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010038752 | [2013/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011105146 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541312 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2541312 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, F21V3/00, F21V3/04, G02F1/1335, H01L33/00, H04N9/30, F21V8/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/0073 (EP,US);
G02B6/0023 (EP,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
G02F1/133603 (EP,US);
G02F1/133604 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | G02F1/13357, F21V3/00, F21V3/04, G02F1/1335, H01L33/00, H04N9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER | [2013/01] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER | [2013/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE TÉLÉVISION | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2012 | Translation filed | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2011 | AL | 04.03.2015 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.01.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.01.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.01.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.01.2011 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009141221 (TAGUCHI TOKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * figures 7,9 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] *; | [Y]JP2007149909 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086] *; | [Y]WO2008047290 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,12-15 * figures 1-2 * * page 1, line 26 - page 14, line 15 *; | [A]EP1521235 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 12,13 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0025] , [0030] * | International search | [Y]WO2007108239 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007149909 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2007141737 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2009076456 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2010039248 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2006058332 |