EP2588382 - CLOSURE ON A RECTANGULAR CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kullberg, Wilhelm 798 Lighthouse Avenue 207 Monterey, CA 93940 / US | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Savova, Ekaterina Nikolaeva Bulinvent Ltd. Manastirski livadi-B Bl. 66-b, fl. 2, app. 33 1404 Sofia / BG | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 11747823.0 | 24.02.2011 | [2016/39] | WO2011US00354 | Priority number, date | GB20100003078 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: GB 201003078 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011106102 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2588382 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588382 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74, // B65D5/06 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
B65D5/062 (US);
B65D5/741 (US);
B65D5/742 (EP,RU,US);
B65D75/58 (RU);
B65D5/061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | B65D5/74, B65D5/62, B65D75/20, B65D75/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS AUF EINEM RECHTECKIGEN BEHÄLTER | [2013/19] | English: | CLOSURE ON A RECTANGULAR CONTAINER | [2013/19] | French: | FERMETURE SUR RÉCIPIENT RECTANGULAIRE | [2016/04] |
Former [2013/19] | FERMETURE POUR RÉCIPIENT RECTANGULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 07.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 27.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 27.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2014 | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2015 | 29.02.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2011 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | LU | 24.02.2017 | MT | 24.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.02.2011 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
IT | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2138406 (MONDI AG [AT]) [X] 1,4-13 * columns 1-7 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0652157 (WEBER CASPERS M G [NL]) [X] 1,4-13 * columns 1-10 * * figures 1-29 *; | [X]US4216864 (AUSTIN JOHN J JR [US]) [X] 1,4-13 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]US3648922 (GEBO LEO P) [A] 1-13 * columns 1-4 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0820936 (SMURFIT SOCAR SA [FR]) [A] 1-13 * columns 1-3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4010822 (WILHELMSTAL WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO8502162 (KULLBERG WILHELM); | [A]US469858 (PEER, JR.; A. DEAN); | [A]US4754917 (GORDON ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US4308956 (STEINKE JOHN J, et al) | by applicant | EP0511358 |