EP2601165 - ETHANOL/FUEL BLENDS FOR USE AS MOTOR FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese International Corporation 1601 West LBJ Freeway Dallas, TX 75234 / US | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALE, Trinity 322 Remington Green Court Houston Texas 77073 / US | 02 /
WOLLRAB, Radmila 7033 Red Coral Drive Pasadena Texas 77505 / US | 03 /
JOHNSTON, Victor, J. 3234 Pleasant Cove Court Houston Texas 77059 / US | 04 /
SARAGER, Lincoln 16110 La Cabana Drive Houston Texas 77062 / US | 05 /
WARNER, R. Jay 3507 East Pine Brook Way Houston Texas 77062 / US | 06 /
WEINER, Heiko 4827 Baywood Drive Pasadena Texas 77505 / US | 07 /
GRUSENDORF, Gerald 14003 Savannah Landing Lane Rosharon Texas 77583 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via G. Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 11749042.5 | 03.08.2011 | WO2011US46511 | Priority number, date | US20100903756 | 13.10.2010 Original published format: US 903756 | US20100852290 | 06.08.2010 Original published format: US 852290 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012018963 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2601165 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C31/08, C07C31/10, C07C29/149, C10L1/02, C10L1/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
C07C29/149 (EP);
C07C31/08 (EP);
C10L1/023 (EP);
C10L1/026 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C31/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | ETHANOL/KRAFTSTOFF-MISCHUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS MOTORKRAFTSTOFFE | [2013/24] | English: | ETHANOL/FUEL BLENDS FOR USE AS MOTOR FUELS | [2013/24] | French: | MÉLANGES ÉTHANOL/CARBURANT À USAGE DANS DES CARBURANTS | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2005028435 (PACE STUART [GB], et al) [I] 1-68 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 17]; example -; table 1 *; | [I]WO2007145490 (LEE YONG MAN [KR]) [I] 1-68 * pages 1, 10-11 * * page 16, line 12 - page 17, line 4; examples 1-3; claims 1,6,10 *; | [E]WO2011097194 (CELANESE INT CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-68 * the whole document * | [XI] - International Fuel Quality Center Hart Downstream Energy Services, "Setting a Quality Standard for Fuel Ethanol- DEH Ethanol Standard 18/2004 Report", (20040101), pages 1 - 56, URL: http://www.environment.gov.au/atmosphere/fuelquality/publications/pubs/ifqc-report.pdf, (20120228), XP055020443 [X] 1,5,13,21,40,43 * chapter 5 entirely; pages 7, 21-25; tables 1,2,3, 6, 7, 12, 14, 15, 17, 18 * [I] 2-4,6-12,14-39,41,42,44-68 | [I] - Ivan Hodac ET AL, "Etahnol Guidelines", (20090301), pages I - 12, URL: http://www.autoalliance.org/files/E100_Guideline.pdf, (20120228), XP055020442 [I] 1-68 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5488185 | US5185481 | US5284983 | US5445716 | US5800681 | US5415741 | US5858031 | US7608744 | US2010029995 | US7208624 | US7115772 | US7005541 | US6657078 | US6627770 | US6143930 | US5599976 | US5144068 | US5026908 | US5001259 | US4994608 | USRE35377E | US5821111 | US6685754 | US4465875 | US4559109 | US4654123 | US6375807 |