EP2609363 - HEATSINK FOR LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litonics Limited Ludlow Road Knighton, Powys LD7 1LP / GB | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Nicolas Paul Ludlow Road Knighton Powys LD7 1LP / GB | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11749224.9 | 19.08.2011 | WO2011GB51571 | Priority number, date | GB20100014428 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: GB 201014428 | GB20100014056 | 23.08.2010 Original published format: GB 201014056 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012025742 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2609363 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21S9/02, F21V29/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
F21V29/85 (EP,US);
F21S9/022 (EP,GB,US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
F21L4/02 (US);
F21V23/0435 (EP,US);
F21V29/67 (EP,US);
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21V29/76 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21V29/767 (EP,US);
H01Q1/44 (EP,US);
F21K9/20 (EP,US);
F21S9/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | KÜHLKÖRPER FÜR EINE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/27] | English: | HEATSINK FOR LIGHTING DEVICE | [2013/27] | French: | DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE POUR DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 27.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008316755 (ZHENG SHI-SONG [CN], et al); | [Y]WO2009017329 (FAWOO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]EP2163808 (SHARP KK [JP]) | Examination | US2007247840 | WO2008124701 | GB2466790 | by applicant | GB2447495 |