EP2611627 - FABRICATED VEHICLE AXLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hendrickson USA, L.L.C. 500 Park Boulevard Suite 1010 Itasca, IL 60143 / US | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUBULKA, John, Stephen 10657 Newbury Street Westchester IL 60154 / US | 02 /
DUDDING, Ashley, Thomas 10025 Church Road Yorkville IL 60560 / US | 03 /
CORTEZ, Jerome, Lim 8110 Abbey Court Tinley Park IL 60477 / US | 04 /
WILTJER, Brian, Scott 19513 Glenbrook Lane Tinley Park IL 60487 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/28] |
Former [2013/28] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11749710.7 | 25.08.2011 | WO2011US49078 | Priority number, date | US20100874982 | 02.09.2010 Original published format: US 874982 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030607 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611627 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611627 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2611627 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60B35/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B60B35/003 (EP,US);
B60B2310/206 (EP,US);
B60B2310/211 (EP,US);
B60B2310/3021 (EP,US);
B60B2360/102 (EP,US);
B60B2360/141 (EP,US);
B60B2360/1444 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | B60B35/06, B60B35/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2015/29] |
Former [2015/28] | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | ||
Former [2013/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORGEFERTIGTE FAHRZEUGACHSE | [2013/28] | English: | FABRICATED VEHICLE AXLE | [2013/28] | French: | ESSIEU DE VÉHICULE FABRIQUÉ | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 02.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US1784856 (URSCHEL BERTIS H) [YD] 1-9 * page 1, line 65 - page 2, line 38; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2009230760 (BUBULKA JOHN STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0069]; figures 3-5, 9, 20 *; | [A]US1690511 (URSCHEL BERTIS H) [A] 1-36 * page 1, line 100 - page 2, line 40; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US2148714 (URSCHEL BERTIS H) [A] 1-36 * page 2, column left, line 65 - column right, line 22 *; | [A]GB289684 (THOMPSON PROD INC) [A] 1-36 * page 3, line 1 - line 73 * | by applicant | US5810377 | US6609764 | US20100874982 | US20080046722 |