EP2542488 - A CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPCO Sweden AB c/o Sandvik AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2018/41] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Nils Håkan Smältostvägen 10 S-81138 Sandviken / SE | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Noréns Patentbyrå AB Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Klöfver, Jörgen Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 11750995.0 | 02.03.2011 | WO2011SE50236 | Priority number, date | SE20100050203 | 03.03.2010 Original published format: SE 1050203 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011108984 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2542488 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G23/44, // B65G15/62, B65G21/10 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B65G15/62 (EP,US);
B65G21/02 (SE);
B65G15/60 (US);
B65G23/44 (EP,SE,US);
B65G21/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | B65G23/44, // B65G15/62 | ||
Former IPC [2013/02] | B65G23/44, B65G21/10, B65G21/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | FÖRDERER | [2013/02] | English: | A CONVEYOR | [2013/02] | French: | CONVOYEUR | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 11.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3733318 (SCHMIDT ERWEPA MASCHF [DE]); | [A]DE3743729 (GEPPERT HELMUT [DE]); | [XI]US6336550 (MUENTENER KURT [DE]); | [I]US6685009 (HOSCH MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [A]US2006151294 (HOSCH MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [I]US7448491 (TIPPERY STEVE [US], et al); | [I]CN101353112 (ZHEJIANG UNIVERSITY CITY COLLE [CN]); | [A]JP4303941B | International search | [X]GB2042453 (ORBIS ENG LTD); | [Y]DE3531552 (POHLE & REHLING GMBH [DE]); | [X]SU1421638 (PROIZV OB SAMOKHODNOJ GORNOJ T [SU]); | [Y]DE3743729 (GEPPERT HELMUT [DE]); | [A]JP2001058713 (Q P CORP); | [Y]US2002008000 (LUTZ DAVID W [US]); | [X]DE20210626U (VOEGELE AG J [DE]); | [Y]US7448491 (TIPPERY STEVE [US], et al) |