EP2608752 - MEDICAL DEVICE AND SYSTEM HAVING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acandis GmbH & Co. KG Kolpingstrasse 5 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTANEO, Giorgio Enzstrasse 8 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
BAIDINGER, Otto August-Kayser-Strasse 33 75175 Pforzheim / DE | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Kilchert, Jochen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Kilchert, Jochen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/27] | Kilchert, Jochen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O.Box 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11751550.2 | 26.08.2011 | WO2011EP04309 | Priority number, date | DE20101035543 | 26.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010035543 | [2013/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012025247 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608752 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2608752 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/90, A61F2/852, A61B17/12 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61B17/12118 (EP,US);
A61F2/852 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61F2002/077 (EP,US);
A61F2002/823 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0076 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0015 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | A61F2/90, A61B17/12 | ||
Former IPC [2013/27] | A61F2/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM MIT EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | [2013/27] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE AND SYSTEM HAVING SUCH A DEVICE | [2013/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ET SYSTÈME COMPORTANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 10.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15152054.1 / EP2881087 | EP18184952.2 / EP3427703 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2011 | AL | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | RS | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | IE | 26.08.2015 | LU | 26.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.08.2011 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PT | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.08.2011 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | |
NO | 28.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5064435 (PORTER CHRISTOPHER H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10,20 * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 12; figures 10,11 * [I] 5; | [XI]US6348066 (PINCHUK LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10-15,17,20 * column 7, line 27 - line 48; figures 12-14 * [I] 18,19; | [Y]DE10301600 (DENDRON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0054] , [0070] - [0072]; figure - *; | [XI]EP1645246 (ADMEDES SCHUESSLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11,20 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,5; | [XYI]US2007168019 (AMPLATZ KURT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-12,14,20 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0049] - [0051] - [0053] , [0056]; figure - * [Y] 8 [I] 5,16; | [XPI]WO2011049823 (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,6,7,9-14,20 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0039] , [0049]; figure - *[I] 5,15,16 | by applicant | DE60128588T | DE102009056450 |