EP2603542 - SECONDARY AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF BIODEGRADABLE DIBLOCK COPOLYESTERS, PROCESSES FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philipps Universität Marburg Biegenstrasse 10 35037 Marburg / DE | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREINER, Andreas Stockwiesenweg 9 35287 Amöneburg / DE | 02 /
AGARWAL, Seema Alfred-Wegener-Str. 7 35039 Marburg / DE | 03 /
BUBEL, Kathrin Hagen Nr. 8 29279 Wittingen / DE | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Stumpf, Peter c/o TransMIT GmbH Kerkrader Strasse 3 35394 Giessen / DE | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 11751574.2 | 12.08.2011 | WO2011EP63950 | Priority number, date | EP20100172840 | 13.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10172840 | [2013/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012020127 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603542 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/672, C08L67/02, D01F6/86, D01D5/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
C08G63/672 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (US);
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
D01D1/02 (EP,US);
D01D5/0038 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRE WÄSSRIGE DISPERSIONEN BIOABBAUBARER DIBLOCKCOPOLYESTER,VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2013/25] | English: | SECONDARY AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF BIODEGRADABLE DIBLOCK COPOLYESTERS, PROCESSES FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | [2013/25] | French: | DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES SECONDAIRES DE COPOLYESTERS À DEUX BLOCS BIODÉGRADABLES, PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 02.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3244011 (CASSELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * example 1 *; | [I]WO2005116109 (DU PONT [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10 * claim - * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO2006089522 (UNIV MARBURG PHILIPPS [DE], et al) [A] 11-14 * claim - *; | [A] - MARCEL THIEME ET AL, "Electrospinning and cutting of ultrafine bioerodible poly(lactide-co-ethylene oxide) tri- and multiblock copolymer fibers for inhalation applications", POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, WILEY & SONS, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, doi:DOI:10.1002/PAT.1617, ISSN 1042-7147, (20090101), pages 1 - 10, (20091213), XP007914973 [A] 11-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pat.1617 | by applicant | WO2006023388 | JP2008248016 |