EP2601777 - COMMUNICATION MANAGEMENT UTILIZING DESTINATION DEVICE USER PRESENCE PROBABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALAZAR, Selena M. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
MOMEYER, Brian 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
FORUTANPOUR, Babak 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SCHEVCIW, Andre Gustavo P. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Loveless, Ian Mark, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11751705.2 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46813 | Priority number, date | US20100851413 | 05.08.2010 Original published format: US 851413 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019137 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2601777 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06T7/20 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (KR);
H04L67/535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERWALTUNG MIT BENUTZERANWESENHEITSWAHRSCHEINLICHKEIT EINES EMPFÄNGERGERÄTS | [2013/24] | English: | COMMUNICATION MANAGEMENT UTILIZING DESTINATION DEVICE USER PRESENCE PROBABILITY | [2013/24] | French: | GESTION DE COMMUNICATION UTILISANT UNE PROBABILITÉ DE PRÉSENCE D'UN UTILISATEUR D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DESTINATION | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 08.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007214228 (HORVITZ ERIC J [US], et al) [X] 1-79 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0007] - [0010] - [0041] , [0042] , [0054] , [0055] , [0071] , [0072] , [0084] , [0093] , [0102] - [0112] *; | [X]WO2007113516 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1-79 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 37 * * page 5, line 30 - page 7, line 24 * * page 8, lines 12-35 * * page 10, lines 25-38 * * page 12, line 18 - page 14, line 17 * * page 15, line 39 - page 17, line 33 * * page 19, lines 13-23 * * page 22, line 23 - page 23, line 33 *; | [X]US2008292079 (TOUTAIN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-79 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0013] - [0015] - [0019] , [0021] - [0027] - [0050] - [0077] - [0099] - [0113] - [0149] - [0175] - [0184] - [0204] * |