EP2545705 - DISPARITY DATA TRANSPORT AND SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saturn Licensing LLC 25 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10022-3211 / US | [2017/39] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EYER, Mark, Kenneth 14917 NE 167th St. Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 02 /
TSUKAGOSHI, Ikuo 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | 01 /
EYER, Mark, Kenneth 14917 NE 167th St. Woodinville WA 98072 / US | ||
02 /
TSUKAGOSHI, Ikuo 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/03] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11753792.8 | 25.02.2011 | WO2011US26291 | Priority number, date | US20100313612P | 12.03.2010 Original published format: US 313612 P | US20100378792P | 31.08.2010 Original published format: US 378792 P | US20100346652P | 22.11.2010 Original published format: US 346652 P | US20100316733P | 23.03.2010 Original published format: US 316733 P | US20100415457P | 19.11.2010 Original published format: US 415457 P | US20100415924P | 22.11.2010 Original published format: US 415924 P | US201113022817 | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US201113022817 | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/03] | US20100313612P | 12.03.2010 | |
US20100378792P | 31.08.2010 | ||
US20100346652P | 22.11.2010 | ||
US20100316733P | 23.03.2010 | ||
US20100415457P | 19.11.2010 | ||
US20100415924P | 22.11.2010 | ||
US20110022817 | 08.02.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011112370 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545705 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, H04N21/81, H04N13/00, H04N21/488 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR);
H04N13/161 (US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/172 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04N13/02, H04N13/00, H04N21/488 | ||
Former IPC [2013/03] | H04N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | DISPARITÄTSDATENTRANSPORT UND -SIGNALISIERUNG | [2017/39] | English: | DISPARITY DATA TRANSPORT AND SIGNALING | [2013/03] | French: | TRANSPORT ET SIGNALISATION DE DONNÉES DE DISPARITÉ | [2013/03] |
Former [2013/03] | DISPARITÄTSDATENTRANSPORT UND .-SIGNALISIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005060758 (PARK TAE JIN [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2006184994 (EYER MARK K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009029278 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009139740 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * abstract * * figure 5 * * page 3, line 29 - line 33 * * page 3, line 9 - line 18 *; | [Y]WO2010010499 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * abstract * * page 5, line 8 - line 18 * | International search | [A]US2003035063 (ORR STEPHEN J [CA]); | [A]US2004010807 (URDANG ERIK G [US], et al); | [A]US2006067592 (WALMSLEY SIMON R [AU], et al); | [A]US7312891 (TSUCHIYA OKINORI [JP], et al); | [A]US2009315979 (JUNG KIL-SOO [KR], et al); | [A]WO2010010499 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2010021141 (YAMASHITA KEN [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2009139740 | WO2010010499 |