EP2524513 - SERVICE LINKAGE TO CAPTION DISPARITY DATA TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EYER, Mark Kenneth 14917 Ne 167th St. Woodinville WA 98072 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | 01 /
EYER, Mark, Kenneth 14917 Ne 167th St. Woodinville WA 98072 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11753806.6 | 01.03.2011 | WO2011US26698 | Priority number, date | US20100313612P | 12.03.2010 Original published format: US 313612 P | US20100316733P | 23.03.2010 Original published format: US 316733 P | US20100346652P | 20.05.2010 Original published format: US 346652 P | US20100378792P | 31.08.2010 Original published format: US 378792 P | US20100415457P | 19.11.2010 Original published format: US 415457 P | US20100415924P | 22.11.2010 Original published format: US 415924 P | US201113022828 | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US201113022828 | [2016/48] |
Former [2012/47] | US20100313612P | 12.03.2010 | |
US20100031673P | 23.03.2010 | ||
US20100346652P | 20.05.2010 | ||
US20100378792P | 31.08.2010 | ||
US20100415457P | 19.11.2010 | ||
US20100415924P | 22.11.2010 | ||
US201113022828 | 08.02.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011112392 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2524513 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/02, H04N13/00, H04N21/488 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04N13/172 (EP);
H04N13/183 (EP);
H04N21/4884 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | H04N13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | DIENSTVERKNÜPFUNG FÜR DEN TRANSPORT VON UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN UNTERTITELUNGSDATEN | [2012/47] | English: | SERVICE LINKAGE TO CAPTION DISPARITY DATA TRANSPORT | [2012/47] | French: | LIAISON DE SERVICE POUR UN TRANSPORT DE DONNÉES DE DISPARITÉ DE SOUS-TITRES | [2012/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 13.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006184994 (EYER MARK K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010010499 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008115222 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5519443 (SALOMON AMNON M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003035063 (ORR STEPHEN J [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009060044 (SUH JONG YEUL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "PROPOSED SMPTE STANDARD FOR TELEVISION - DTV CLOSED-CAPTION SERVER TO ENCODER INTERFACE", SMPTE - MOTION IMAGING JOURNAL, SOCIETY OF MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (19991101), vol. 108, no. 11, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 830 - 833, XP000877922 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5519443 (SALOMON AMNON M [US], et al); | [Y]US2003035063 (ORR STEPHEN J [CA]); | [Y]US2009060044 (SUH JONG YEUL [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2010010499 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) |