EP2545426 - MULTIMODAL TEXT INPUT SYSTEM, SUCH AS FOR USE WITH TOUCH SCREENS ON MOBILE PHONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. One Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. One Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
For all designated states Keisense, Inc. 151 New Park Avenue Hartford, CT 06106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAY, David 3824 Woodlawn Avenue N Seattle WA 98103 / US | 02 /
VAN MEURS, Pim 1 Wayside Road Burlington MA 01803 / US | 03 /
UNRUH, Erland 1215 Dexter Avenue North 701 Seattle WA 98109 / US | 04 /
SHARAN, Santosh 59 Piper Road Acton MA 01720 / US | 05 /
KESSLER, Gordon 59 Fox Den Road Mount Kisco NY 10549 / US | 06 /
AGARWAL, Mayank 190 Algonquin Trail Ashland MA 01721 / US | 07 /
SIGEL, Greg 57 Manor Road Kentfield CA 94904 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11754256.3 | 14.03.2011 | WO2011US28387 | Priority number, date | US20100313864P | 15.03.2010 Original published format: US 313864 P | US20100313423P | 12.03.2010 Original published format: US 313423 P | US20100313454P | 12.03.2010 Original published format: US 313454 P | US20100316799P | 23.03.2010 Original published format: US 316799 P | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011113057 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545426 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G06F3/041 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/0237 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/023 (US);
G06F16/3322 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US);
G06F40/242 (EP,US);
G06F40/274 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0381 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | MULTIMODALES TEXTEINGABESYSTEM, WIE ETWA ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMEN AUF MOBILTELEFONEN | [2013/03] | English: | MULTIMODAL TEXT INPUT SYSTEM, SUCH AS FOR USE WITH TOUCH SCREENS ON MOBILE PHONES | [2013/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SAISIE DE TEXTE MULTIMODE, À UTILISER PAR EXEMPLE AVEC LES ÉCRANS TACTILES DES TÉLÉPHONES MOBILES | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 25.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Josh Lowensohn, "Why your next phone could have Swype's keyboard - CNET", (20090601), URL: https://www.cnet.com/news/why-your-next-phone-could-have-swypes-keyboard/, (20170405), XP055361915 [X] 1,6-10 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 | [XI] - mobileburn, "Swype for Android demo", Youtube, (20091229), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=mRUoWUhcRlE, (20170406), XP054977246 [X] 1,6-10 * the whole document * * Video positions at 0:27 - input track 0:30 - word input 0:40 - multiple candidates * [I] 1-15 | International search | [X]US2007040813 (KUSHLER CLIFFORD A [US], et al); | [Y]US2009239587 (NEGRON ERIC [US], et al); | [Y]US2007259717 (MATTICE HAROLD E [US], et al); | [Y]US2005283364 (LONGE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2009284471 (LONGE MICHAEL R [US], et al) |