EP2600919 - IMPROVED FILTER FOR REMOVING SUBSTANCES FROM BLOOD OR FROM BLOOD DERIVATIVES, AND A METHOD FOR OBTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GVS S.p.A. Via Roma 50 40069 Zola Predosa (Bologna) / IT | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCAGLIARINI, Massimo Via Enrico fermi 40033 Casalecchio Di Reno (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
QUERZÉ, Luca Via Nazionale Toscana 6/D 40068 S. Lazzaro Di Savena (Bologna) / IT | [2016/37] |
Former [2013/24] | 01 /
SCAGLIARINI, Massimo Via Enrico fermi I-40033 Casalecchio Di Reno (Bologna) / IT | ||
02 /
QUERZÉ, Luca Via Nazionale Toscana 6/D I-40068 S. Lazzaro Di Savena (Bologna) / IT | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [2013/24] | Application number, filing date | 11755119.2 | 29.07.2011 | [2016/37] | WO2011IB01792 | Priority number, date | IT2010MI01514 | 06.08.2010 Original published format: IT MI20101514 | [2013/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012017291 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2600919 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2600919 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, B01D39/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A61M1/3633 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/341 (KR);
A61M1/3413 (KR);
A61M1/342 (KR);
A61M1/3601 (KR);
A61M1/3615 (KR);
B01D39/00 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/18 (KR,US);
B05D3/0209 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/24] | A61M1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FILTER ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON STOFFEN AUS BLUT ODER BLUTDERIVATEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/24] | English: | IMPROVED FILTER FOR REMOVING SUBSTANCES FROM BLOOD OR FROM BLOOD DERIVATIVES, AND A METHOD FOR OBTAINING IT | [2013/24] | French: | FILTRE AMÉLIORÉ POUR EXTRAIRE DES SUBSTANCES DU SANG OU DE DÉRIVÉS DU SANG, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 09.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2011 | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.07.2011 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01224324 (TERUMO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YA]US2002122939 (WEI NING [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] - [0030] - [0033] *[A] 10-12; | [A]WO2005113136 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 1 *; | [XYI]CN100346861C (UNIV DONGHUA [CN]) [X] 6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9 [I] 10-12; | [XD]EP1897571 (FRESENIUS HEMOCARE ITALIA SRL [IT]) [XD] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052]; claims 1-12 * | Examination | EP1666129 | by applicant | EP0189757 | US4701267 | EP0329303 | WO2005113136 | EP1897571 |