EP2603097 - PRODUCT FOR THE UPPER GASTRIC SPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Gervais Danone 17, Boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | For all designated states Danone Argentina S.A. Moreno 877 Floor 14° Buenos Aires / AR | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEILL, Ricardo, Julian Jose Hernandez 1972 Caba CP 1426 / AR | 02 /
VALENTINI, Céline 18bis avenue de la division Leclerc F-92320 Chatillon / FR | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11755287.7 | 09.08.2011 | WO2011EP63697 | Priority number, date | WO2010IB02436 | 13.08.2010 Original published format: PCT/IB2010/002436 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012020018 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603097 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K31/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A61K33/08 (EP,US);
A23C9/00 (EP,US);
A23C9/1322 (EP,US);
A23C9/133 (EP,US);
A23C9/137 (EP,US);
A23L29/206 (EP,US);
A23L29/272 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/194 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A23L33/125 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/5054 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/502, A23V2250/5054 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | PRODUKT FÜR DEN OBEREN MAGENBEREICH | [2013/25] | English: | PRODUCT FOR THE UPPER GASTRIC SPHERE | [2013/25] | French: | PRODUIT POUR LA SPHÈRE GASTRIQUE SUPÉRIEURE | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010216754 (HILL MALCOLM [US]) [X] 1,2,5-11,16,20-29 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0017] - [0022] - [0030] , [0087] - [0167]; claims 1-19 *; | [X]US2011081411 (PERRETT STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,16,20,24-29 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] - [ 68]; claims 1,5,6,34 *; | [X]US2004120991 (GARDNER LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15,20,24 * the whole document *; | [AD]US7090832 (ZANONE JOHN [US], et al) [AD] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [X]US6080401 (REDDY MALIREDDY S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-11,14,16-19,23,24 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7090832 | EP1949799 |