EP2611467 - SMALL LIPOSOMES FOR DELIVERY OF IMMUNOGEN-ENCODING RNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2017/29] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEALL, Andrew c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Inc. PO Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 02 /
VERMA, Ayush c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Klaczynska, Sarah Elizabeth GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents, CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2013/28] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11755497.2 | 31.08.2011 | [2022/29] | WO2011US49873 | Priority number, date | US20100378831P | 31.08.2010 Original published format: US 378831 P | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030901 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611467 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611467 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K9/127, A61K39/00, A61K9/00 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61K9/127 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N15/88 (EP,RU,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
A61K9/1277 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18534 (EP,US);
C12N2770/36143 (EP,US);
C12N2770/36171 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEINE LIPOSOMEN ZUR FREISETZUNG VON EIN IMMUNOGEN KODIERENDER RNS | [2022/22] | English: | SMALL LIPOSOMES FOR DELIVERY OF IMMUNOGEN-ENCODING RNA | [2013/28] | French: | PETITES LIPOSOMES À LIBÉRATION D'ARN QUI CODE UN IMMUNOGÈNE | [2022/22] |
Former [2013/28] | KLEINE LIPOSOME ZUR FREISETZUNG VON IMMUNOGEN-CODIERENDER RNA | ||
Former [2013/28] | PETITS LIPOSOMES DESTINÉS À L'ADMINISTRATION D'UN ARN CODANT POUR UN IMMUNOGÈNE | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 04.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21208092.3 / EP4008357 | EP22166818.9 / EP4043040 | EP22175210.8 / EP4066819 | EP22190665.4 / EP4122451 | EP23179893.5 / EP4233841 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2022 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2023
18.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI 45 avenue de la Grande Armeé 75017 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 02
18.04.2023
20.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Höpfner, Sebastian c/o ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Hansastrasse 32 80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Höpfner, Sebastian ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | 03
18.04.2023
20.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | 04
20.04.2023
21.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Margaret Dixon Limited 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | 05
20.04.2023
24.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE JG Oppositions Limited Floor 15 The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Griffin, Philippa Jane Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2023/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2023
18.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI 45 avenue de la Grande Armeé 75017 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
18.04.2023
20.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Höpfner, Sebastian c/o ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Hansastrasse 32 80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Höpfner, Sebastian ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | |||
03
18.04.2023
20.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann, Hans Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | |||
04
20.04.2023
21.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Margaret Dixon Limited 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
05
20.04.2023
24.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE JG Oppositions Limited Floor 15 The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Griffin, Philippa Jane Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2023/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2023
18.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI 45 avenue de la Grande Armeé 75017 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
18.04.2023
20.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Höpfner, Sebastian c/o ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Hansastrasse 32 80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Höpfner, Sebastian ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | |||
03
18.04.2023
20.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann, Hans Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | |||
04
20.04.2023
Margaret Dixon Limited 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | 09.05.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.11.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0786522 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US]); | [X]US5750390 (THOMPSON JAMES D [US], et al); | [X]WO9952503 (WAYNE JOHN CANCER INST [US]); | [X]US5972704 (DRAPER KENNETH G [US], et al); | [X]EP1637144 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JP2007112768 (UNIV KYOTO, et al) | Opposition | WO9011092 | WO2005120152 | WO2006078294 | WO2011005799 | WO2011008974 | WO2011068810 | WO2012006376 | WO2012006378 | WO2014160243 | WO2017004143 | WO2017075531 | WO2022137133 | WO2007047749 | WO2012006369 | WO2012006372 | WO2012006377 | WO02095023 | WO2005121348 | WO2012030901 |