EP2690820 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR MAPPING SERVICE INSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/23] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Fei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yizhou Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11755698.5 | 26.04.2011 | [2016/23] | WO2011CN73322 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011113381 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2690820 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2690820 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
H04L12/4662 (EP,US);
H04L47/17 (US);
H04L45/50 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | H04L12/24, H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON DIENSTINSTANZEN | [2014/05] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR MAPPING SERVICE INSTANCE | [2014/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE MAPPER DES INSTANCES DE SERVICE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2013 | Translation filed | 24.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 23.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2011 | AL | 08.06.2016 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | HR | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2226973 (JUNIPER NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,7-9,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0069] *; | [XA] - RADIA PERLMAN INTEL LABS DONALD EASTLAKE 3RD STELLAR SWITCHES DINESH G DUTT SILVANO GAI CISCO SYSTEMS ANOOP GHANWANI BROCADE, "RBridges: Base Protocol Specification; draft-ietf-trill-rbridge-protocol-16.txt", RBRIDGES: BASE PROTOCOL SPECIFICATION; DRAFT-IETF-TRILL-RBRIDGE-PROTOCOL-16.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20100305), no. 16, pages 1 - 117, XP015067710 [X] 1,7,12 * pages 31-32 * [A] 2,3,8,9 | [X] - Donald Eastlake, "Future TRILL Work 2", Proceedings Meeting 79 IETF TRILL Working Group, (20101101), URL: http://www.ietf.org/proceedings/79/slides/trill-7/trill-7.htm, (20131127), XP055090502 [X] 1-3,7-9,12 * pages 10-18 * | [I] - Emmanuel Hocdet, "[rbridge] Break 4096 VLAN limit", IETF TRILL WG mailing list, (20100910), URL: http://www.ietf.org/mail-archive/web/trill/current/msg01119.html, (20131128), XP055090759 [I] 1-3,7-9,12 * the whole document * | [I] - Benson Schliesser, "Re: [rbridge] Break 4096 VLAN limit", IETF TRILL WG mailing list, (20100911), URL: http://www.ietf.org/mail-archive/web/trill/current/msg01123.html, (20131128), XP055090761 [I] 1-3,7-9,12 * the whole document * | [T] - DONALD EASTLAKE MINGUI ZHANG HUAWEI PUNEET AGARWAL BROADCOM DINESH DUTT CISCO RADIA PERLMAN INTEL LABS, "RBridges: Fine-Grained Labeling; draft-eastlake-trill-rbridge-fine-labeling-00.txt", RBRIDGES: FINE-GRAINED LABELING; DRAFT-EASTLAKE-TRILL-RBRIDGE-FINE-LABELING-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20110705), pages 1 - 20, XP015076942 [T] 1-3,7-9,12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]CN101043395 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2008019385 (SULTAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]CN101133407 (CISCO TECH INC [US]) |