EP2548958 - AGENT FOR IMPROVING GENE TRANSFER EFFICIENCY TO MAMMALIAN CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaguchi University 1677-1, Yoshida Yamaguchi-shi Yamaguchi 753-8511 / JP | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKADA, Rinji c/o Faculty of Engineering Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Mikiko c/o Faculty of Engineering Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2013/04] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11755871.8 | 13.03.2011 | [2017/47] | WO2011JP01449 | Priority number, date | JP20100057732 | 15.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010057732 | [2013/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011114678 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2548958 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2548958 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N15/88 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C12N15/90 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2013/04] | C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL FÜR VERBESSERTE GENTRANSFER-EFFIZIENZ IN SÄUGETIERZELLEN | [2013/04] | English: | AGENT FOR IMPROVING GENE TRANSFER EFFICIENCY TO MAMMALIAN CELLS | [2013/04] | French: | AGENT POUR L'AMÉLIORATION DE L'EFFICACITÉ DE TRANSFERT GÉNIQUE DANS DES CELLULES DE MAMMIFÈRE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2012 | Translation filed | 10.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 11.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2011 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IE | 13.03.2018 | LU | 13.03.2018 | MT | 13.03.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.03.2011 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.03.2011 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KOUMBI ET AL, "Detailed studies on the mechanism and factors mediating lipofection potency of cationic phosphonolipid-based gene transfer into human cells", BLOOD CELLS, MOLECULES AND DISEASES, LAJOLLA, US, (20080212), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BCMD.2007.10.054, ISSN 1079-9796, pages 272 - 273, XP022477852 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcmd.2007.10.054 | [A] - JUNG HEE JUNG ET AL, "Carassius auratus-originated recombinant histone H1C-terminal peptide as gene delivery material", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (200801), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 17 - 22, XP002711664 [A] 1-9 * page 17 - page 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP070069B | [A] - CHABAUD PAULINE ET AL, "Cationic nucleoside lipids for gene delivery", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 17, no. 2, doi:10.1021/BC050162Q, ISSN 1043-1802, (20060301), pages 466 - 472, (20060208), XP002490412 [A] 1-9 * page 466 - page 468 * * page 471; figures 5, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc050162q | [A] - NIMESH S ET AL, "Polyethylenimine nanoparticles as efficient transfecting agents for mammalian cells", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 110, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2005.10.014, ISSN 0168-3659, (20060110), pages 457 - 468, (20060110), XP024957400 [A] 1-9 * page 457 - page 460; figure 6 * * page 465 - page 466 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2005.10.014 | International search | [A]JP2008540601 (CUREVAC GMBH); | [A]WO2007046356 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) | [X] - ZAITSEV S. ET AL, "Polyelectrolyte Nanoparticles Mediate Vascular Gene Delivery", PHARMACEUT. RES., (2004), vol. 21, no. 9, pages 1656 - 1661 | [A] - GESLAIN R. ET AL, "Functional Analysis of Human tRNA Isodecoders", J. MOL. BIOL., (200912), vol. 396, pages 821 - 831 | by applicant | JP2005269920 | JP2009195197 | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 114, pages 2221 - 2225 | - THE JOURNAL OF GENE MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 3, pages 115 - 124 | - "Molecular Cloning", Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1987), pages 1 - 38 |