EP2643198 - METHOD FOR SECURING A CONTROL SYSTEM OF A RECONFIGURABLE MULTI-UNIT VEHICLE, AND SECURED CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 40 avenue des Fruitiers 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2015/25] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, boulevard Finot 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex 2 / FR | ||
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Siemens SAS 9 Boulevard Finot 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENU, Eric 20 rue Alexis Maneyrol 92370 Chaville / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/40] | 01 /
CHENU, Eric 20 rue Alexis Maneyrol F-92370 Chaville / FR | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11757325.3 | 15.09.2011 | [2017/44] | WO2011EP66032 | Priority number, date | EP20100290624 | 23.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10290624 | [2013/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069223 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643198 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2643198 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B61L15/00 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B61L15/0072 (EP,US);
B61L15/00 (KR);
B61L15/0036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG EINES STEUERSYSTEMS EINES NEUKONFIGURIERBAREN FAHRZEUGS AUS MEHREREN EINHEITEN SOWIE GESICHERTES STEUERSYSTEM | [2013/40] | English: | METHOD FOR SECURING A CONTROL SYSTEM OF A RECONFIGURABLE MULTI-UNIT VEHICLE, AND SECURED CONTROL SYSTEM | [2013/40] | French: | MÉTHODE DE SÉCURISATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE PILOTAGE D'UN VÉHICULE MULTI-UNITÉ RECONFIGURABLE ET SYSTÈME DE PILOTAGE SÉCURISÉ | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | IT | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 01.11.2017 | |
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1065128 (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] - [0022]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2007118837 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 20 * * page 5, line 31 - page 5, line 35 * * page 10, line 18 - page 12, line 19 * * page 13, line 15 - page 14, line 34 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2213545 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] , [0013] - [0025]; figures 1-3 *; | [A] - MUELLER R ET AL, "EINE AUTOMATISCHE U-BAHN. TECHNISCHE BESONDERHEITEN DER AGT-FAHRZEUGE FUER NUERNBERG", ETR EISENBAHNTECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, HESTRA-VERLAG. DARMSTADT, DE, (20031101), vol. 52, pages 679 - 685, XP001536300 [A] 1,7,12 * page 684, paragraph 3.11 * |