EP2619754 - BUILT-IN VERBAL TRANSLATOR HAVING BUILT-IN SPEAKER RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pedre, Joël 14C Boulevard de l'Océan Manapany les Bains 97480 Saint Joseph / FR | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11757357.6 | 09.08.2011 | WO2011FR00463 | Priority number, date | FR20100003741 | 21.09.2010 Original published format: FR 1003741 | [2013/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012038612 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619754 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/04, G10L15/26, G06F17/28, H04R1/10 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G10L13/00 (EP,US);
G06F40/58 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US);
H04R1/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER SPRACHÜBERSETZER MIT INTEGRIERTER SPRECHERERKENNUNG | [2018/41] | English: | BUILT-IN VERBAL TRANSLATOR HAVING BUILT-IN SPEAKER RECOGNITION | [2013/31] | French: | TRADUCTEUR VERBAL INTÉGRÉ À PERCEPTION D'INTERLOCUTEUR INTÉGRÉE | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/31] | INTEGRIERTER SPRACHÜEBRSETZER MIT INTEGRIERTER SPRECHERERKENNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 18.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2921735 (PEDRE JOEL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009132646 (GN NETCOM AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * | Examination | US2007100637 | US6101256 | US2010185432 | by applicant | FR2921735 | WO2009080908 | US2009120429 | US6101256 | US2007054705 | US2005282591 | WO2009132646 | US4949378 | US2003115059 | WO03052624 | US6157727 | US2006282269 | US2004186727 | US2008091407 | US2008077387 |